This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2018 at 07:45:49 (UTC).

Joubert et al v. Hussain et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 Joubert filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Hussain. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Demetris Stokes

Olga Maria Acevedo

Katherine Patten

Keton Hollingsworth

Jacqueline Joubert

Defendants

Victory Duncan

Lisa Childs

Zachary Hussain

Cheri Newman

Waylon Cawley

Harriet Coles

Michael Newman

Sondy Lawrence

Jim Hannah

Edna Awad

Tina Bland

Columbia County, Georgia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles H. Rollins

Attorney at Charles H. Rollins, P.C.

561 Greene Street

Augusta, GA 30901

Defendant Attorney

Frank Adam Nelson

Attorney at Fleming & Nelson, LLP

P.O. Box 2208

Evans, GA 30809

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) RESPONSE to #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Cheri Newman, Tina Bland, Sondy Lawrence, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Edna Awad, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Michael Newman, Waylon Cawley filed by Olga Maria Acevedo, Keton Hollingsworth, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Demetris Stokes. (Rollins, Charles) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting Defendants' #18 Motion to Stay. The Court stays all discovery in this action pending resolution of the motion for judgment on the pleadings. Should any portion of the case remain after resolution of the motion, the parties shall submit a Rule 26(f) Report within seven days of the presiding District Judge's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/03/2018. (jlh) Modified on 10/3/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#19

(#19) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Tina Bland. (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#16

(#16) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Edna Awad, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman. (Nelson, Frank) Modified on 10/2/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman.(Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Adam Nelson on behalf of Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

1 #13

Exhibit N

1 #12

Exhibit M

1 #11

Exhibit L

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Demetris Stokes, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Olga Maria Acevedo, Keton Hollingsworth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, and #13 Exhibit N.) (Exhibits G & K to be filed conventionally.)(jlh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RESPONSE to #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Cheri Newman, Tina Bland, Sondy Lawrence, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Edna Awad, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Michael Newman, Waylon Cawley filed by Olga Maria Acevedo, Keton Hollingsworth, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Demetris Stokes. (Rollins, Charles) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting Defendants' #18 Motion to Stay. The Court stays all discovery in this action pending resolution of the motion for judgment on the pleadings. Should any portion of the case remain after resolution of the motion, the parties shall submit a Rule 26(f) Report within seven days of the presiding District Judge's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/03/2018. (jlh) Modified on 10/3/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Tina Bland. (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. (jlh) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Stay re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Edna Awad, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman. (Nelson, Frank) Modified on 10/2/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to Complaint by Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman.(Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Adam Nelson on behalf of Edna Awad, Tina Bland, Waylon Cawley, Lisa Childs, Harriet Coles, Victory Duncan, Jim Hannah, Zachary Hussain, Sondy Lawrence, Cheri Newman, Michael Newman (Nelson, Frank) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Olga Maria Acevedo. (Rollins, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Keton Hollingsworth. (Rollins, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Katherine Patten. (Rollins, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Demetris Stokes. (Rollins, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (jlh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Olga Maria Acevedo, Keton Hollingsworth, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Demetris Stokes. (Rollins, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing by Olga Maria Acevedo Exhibits G and K (Rollins, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/07/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2442479. (jlh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Demetris Stokes, Jacqueline Joubert, Katherine Patten, Olga Maria Acevedo, Keton Hollingsworth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, and #13 Exhibit N.) (Exhibits G & K to be filed conventionally.)(jlh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less