This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2018 at 05:57:54 (UTC).

Jordan v. Osmundson et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 Jordan filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Osmundson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Billy McDade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01141

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Billy McDade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raphael Jordan

Canton, IL 61520

Defendants

Wexford Co

. Williams

Dr . Osmundson

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Raphael Jordan. Responses due by 4/19/2018 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Raphael Jordan.(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 4/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Raphael Jordan.(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $15.27. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 4/5/2018. (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Raphael Jordan. Responses due by 4/19/2018 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Raphael Jordan. (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Raphael Jordan.(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 4/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Raphael Jordan.(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Osmundson is a litigant

Latest cases where Wexford, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAMS is a litigant