This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2018 at 08:07:41 (UTC).

Jordan v. BP Peterman Law Group LLC

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Jordan filed an Other lawsuit against BP Peterman Law Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01621

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Jordan

Defendant

BP Peterman Law Group LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Briane F Pagel, Jr

Attorney at Lawton & Cates SC

345 W Washington Ave - Ste 201

Madison, WI 53703

Defendant Attorney

Joseph J Sarmiento, IV

Attorney at Karbal Cohen Economou Silk & Dunne LLC

150 S Wacker Dr - Ste 1700

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2018 (Court Reporter Rich Ehrlich) (cl) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/30/2018) (asc).

#11

(#11) Joint PRETRIAL REPORT by Richard Jordan. (Pagel, Briane)

#10

(#10) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Richard Jordan re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (Pagel, Briane)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 11/27/2018. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) BRIEF in Support filed by BP Peterman Law Group LLC re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sarmiento, Joseph)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by BP Peterman Law Group LLC. (Sarmiento, Joseph)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J Sarmiento, IV on behalf of BP Peterman Law Group LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph J. Sarmiento IV (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sarmiento, Joseph)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Richard Jordan. (Pagel, Briane)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Jordan. BP Peterman Law Group LLC served on 10/17/2018. (Pagel, Briane)

#2

(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Richard Jordan (Pagel, Briane)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against BP Peterman Law Group LLC by Richard Jordan. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2943634) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pagel, Briane)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2018 (Court Reporter Rich Ehrlich) (cl) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/30/2018) (asc).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint PRETRIAL REPORT by Richard Jordan. (Pagel, Briane)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Richard Jordan re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (Pagel, Briane)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 11/27/2018. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEF in Support filed by BP Peterman Law Group LLC re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sarmiento, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by BP Peterman Law Group LLC. (Sarmiento, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J Sarmiento, IV on behalf of BP Peterman Law Group LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph J. Sarmiento IV (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sarmiento, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Richard Jordan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pagel, Briane)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Richard Jordan. (Pagel, Briane)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • SECOND NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Jordan. BP Peterman Law Group LLC served on 10/17/2018. (Pagel, Briane)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Summons Issued as to BP Peterman Law Group LLC. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Richard Jordan (Pagel, Briane)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against BP Peterman Law Group LLC by Richard Jordan. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2943634) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pagel, Briane)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.