This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2019 at 07:56:34 (UTC).

Jones v. State Of Virginia

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 Jones filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against State Of Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa Carroll Buchanan and Leonie M. Brinkema. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01595

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W.-Jeremiah Jones

Woodbridge, VA 22193

Defendant

State Of Virginia

Manassas, VA 20110

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and ORDERED that Jones's complaint {Dkt. No. #1 ] be and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/22/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies mailed as directed in the order. (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that Ebert file promptly a standalone motion to dismiss, notice a hearing date or waive oral argument on the motion, and provide plaintiff with a Roseboro notice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/14/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies mailed as directed in the order. (Entered: 02/14/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) Defendant's Paul B. Ebert Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) by State Of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

Addendum A

1 #11

Receipt

1 #10

Proposed Summons

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State Of Virginia ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683076322.), filed by W.-Jeremiah Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Receipt)(lcre, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and ORDERED that Jones's complaint {Dkt. No. #1 ] be and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/22/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies mailed as directed in the order. (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. The filer user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument with Roseboro per LMB Order. (acha, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that Ebert file promptly a standalone motion to dismiss, notice a hearing date or waive oral argument on the motion, and provide plaintiff with a Roseboro notice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/14/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies mailed as directed in the order. (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's Paul B. Ebert Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) by State Of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #4 Defendant Paul B. Ebert Memorandum In Support of Motion to filed by State Of Virginia. The filer has been notified to file his Motion to Dismiss to support his memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss. The filer has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant Paul B. Ebert Memorandum In Support of Motion to filed by State Of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Addendum A, #2 Envelope)(acha, ) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to: State Of Virginia served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(acha, ) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to State Of Virginia. (lcre, )(copy of Summons mailed to Plaintiff Pro-Se) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against State Of Virginia ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683076322.), filed by W.-Jeremiah Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Receipt)(lcre, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less