This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 08:09:10 (UTC).

Jones v. Southern University et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Southern University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01034

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shantrice L. Jones

Lakeland, FL 33811

Defendants

Terrilynn Gillis

Amelia Major

Sage Rehabilitation Outpatient

Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean

Southern University

Elaine Lewnau

Leigh Ann Baker

Does 1-10

Janet Rami

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Andy J. Dupre

Attorney at Flanagan Partners, LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2405

New Orleans, LA 70170

Camille Elise Gauthier

Attorney at Flanagan Partners LLP

201 St. Charles Avel, Suite 2405

New Orleans, LA 70170

Thomas M. Flanagan

Attorney at Flanagan Partners LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2405

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Amelia Major. No longer employed at Sage Rehab. (US Marshal, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Shantrice L. Jones (EDC) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Leigh Ann Baker, Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean, Terrilynn Gillis, Elaine Lewnau, Janet Rami, Southern University. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Flanagan, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

12 #2

Proposed Motion

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Ex Parte Combined MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits and MOTION to Strike Rec. Doc. #10 by Leigh Ann Baker, Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean, Terrilynn Gillis, Elaine Lewnau, Janet Rami, Southern University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Motion, #3 Proposed Memorandum)(Flanagan, Thomas) Modified on 1/10/2019 to edit text (SGO). (Entered: 01/08/2019)

12 #3

Proposed Memorandum

10 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

(#9) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/21/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/07/2019. (NLT) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Leigh Ann Baker served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (US Marshal, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file all future pleadings as required by the Local Rules of this Court. Any future pleadings submitted directly to chambers may be stricken, and/or other sanctions assessed to Plaintiff, for failure to comply with this Order. The #5 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendants' responsive pleadings due 1/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2018. (SWE) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#5

(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time (Responsive Pleadings) by Leigh Ann Baker, Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean, Terrilynn Gillis, Elaine Lewnau, Janet Rami, Southern University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flanagan, Thomas) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE to Defendants' #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaintfiled by Shantrice L. Jones. (BLR) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Leigh Ann Baker, Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean, Terrilynn Gillis, Elaine Lewnau, Amelia Major, Janet Rami, Sage Rehabilitation Outpatient, Southern University. Summons submitted to the USM for service. (SWE) Modified on 12/3/2018 to flatten pages (SWE). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shantrice L. Jones. (EDC) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

3 #1

USM 285

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the complaint without prepayment of costs and will issue process to the defendants. The U.S. Marshal Service shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendants wherever found. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (SWE) Modified on 11/28/2018 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Amelia Major. No longer employed at Sage Rehab. (US Marshal, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Shantrice L. Jones (EDC) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Ex Parte Combined MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits and MOTION to Strike Rec. Doc. #10 by Leigh Ann Baker, Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean, Terrilynn Gillis, Elaine Lewnau, Janet Rami, Southern University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Motion, #3 Proposed Memorandum)(Flanagan, Thomas) Modified on 1/10/2019 to edit text (SGO). (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Strike the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (EDC) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Leigh Ann Baker, Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean, Terrilynn Gillis, Elaine Lewnau, Janet Rami, Southern University. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Flanagan, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/21/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/07/2019. (NLT) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Leigh Ann Baker served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (US Marshal, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Reset Deadlines: Leigh Ann Baker answer due 1/7/2019; Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean answer due 1/7/2019; Terrilynn Gillis answer due 1/7/2019; Elaine Lewnau answer due 1/7/2019; Janet Rami answer due 1/7/2019; Southern University answer due 1/7/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file all future pleadings as required by the Local Rules of this Court. Any future pleadings submitted directly to chambers may be stricken, and/or other sanctions assessed to Plaintiff, for failure to comply with this Order. The #5 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendants' responsive pleadings due 1/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2018. (SWE) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to Defendants' #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaintfiled by Shantrice L. Jones. (BLR) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time (Responsive Pleadings). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time (Responsive Pleadings) by Leigh Ann Baker, Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean, Terrilynn Gillis, Elaine Lewnau, Janet Rami, Southern University. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flanagan, Thomas) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Leigh Ann Baker, Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean, Terrilynn Gillis, Elaine Lewnau, Amelia Major, Janet Rami, Sage Rehabilitation Outpatient, Southern University. Summons submitted to the USM for service. (SWE) Modified on 12/3/2018 to flatten pages (SWE). (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the complaint without prepayment of costs and will issue process to the defendants. The U.S. Marshal Service shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendants wherever found. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (SWE) Modified on 11/28/2018 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shantrice L. Jones. (EDC) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Leigh Ann Baker, Donna Fitzgerald-Dejean, Terrilynn Gillis, Elaine Lewnau, Amelia Major, Sage Rehabilitation Outpatient, Southern University, filed by Shantrice L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 cover sheet, #2 envelope)(EDC) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.