This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2019 at 07:49:45 (UTC).

Jones v. Defenders, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 Jones filed an Other lawsuit against Defenders, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton, Thomas L. Parker and Sheryl H. Lipman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02770

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judges

Thomas L. Parker

Sheryl H. Lipman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Jones

Defendant

Defenders, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank H. Kerney, III

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

201 N. Franklin St., #700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary A. Kisber

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ-Memphis

165 Madison Ave, Ste 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Robert F. Tom

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON-Memphis

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 2/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#16

(#16) Defenders, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Defenders, Inc..(Kisber, Zachary) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Defenders, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2918489), filed by Donna Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDERS, INC. #14 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/13/18. (shl) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Set Aside Default Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defenders, Inc. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Defenders, Inc.. (Kisber, Zachary) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Tom on behalf of Defenders, Inc. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#12

(#12) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman added. Judge Thomas L. Parker no longer assigned to case. (jae) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Kisber on behalf of Defenders, Inc. (Kisber, Zachary) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Subpoena by Donna Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

10 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defenders, Inc.. Motion terminated: #8 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Donna Jones. (jae) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Entry of Default by Donna Jones. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Jones as to Defenders, Inc.. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 2/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Defenders, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Defenders, Inc..(Kisber, Zachary) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDERS, INC. #14 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/13/18. (shl) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Set Aside Default Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defenders, Inc. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Defenders, Inc.. (Kisber, Zachary) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Tom on behalf of Defenders, Inc. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman added. Judge Thomas L. Parker no longer assigned to case. (jae) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Kisber on behalf of Defenders, Inc. (Kisber, Zachary) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Subpoena by Donna Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defenders, Inc.. Motion terminated: #8 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Donna Jones. (jae) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Entry of Default by Donna Jones. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Jones as to Defenders, Inc.. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Defenders, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defenders, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2918489), filed by Donna Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.