This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2019 at 16:05:23 (UTC).

JONES v. CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 JONES filed an Other lawsuit against CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-MC-00100

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMOS N. JONES

Defendants

ROBERT COGSWELL

JOHN BRADLEY CREED

J. RICH LEONARD

CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA

CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY

SUSAN THROWER

TIMOTHY ZINNECKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arinderjit Dhali

Attorney at DHALI & REIMER PLLC

1828 L Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Joseph Murphy

Attorney at OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART, P.C.

1909 K Street, N.W., Tenth Floor

Washington, DC 20006-1167

Regina W. Calabro

Attorney at OLGETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART P.C.

4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1100

Raleigh, NC 27609

Zachary Stevens Stinson

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1909 K Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) OPINION and ORDER granting #2 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and amending the Court's Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in Case No. 18-cv-321. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/04/2018. (lccrc1) Modified on 9/4/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#4

(#4) REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Sanctions filed by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER. (ztd) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#3

(#3) Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Sanctions filed by AMOS N. JONES. (ztd) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Sanctions by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (ztd) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#1

(#1) ORDER directing opening of miscellaneous case regarding Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/25/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/25/2018) (ztd) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) OPINION and ORDER granting #2 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and amending the Court's Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in Case No. 18-cv-321. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/04/2018. (lccrc1) Modified on 9/4/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Sanctions filed by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER. (ztd) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Sanctions filed by AMOS N. JONES. (ztd) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Sanctions by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (ztd) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ORDER directing opening of miscellaneous case regarding Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/25/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/25/2018) (ztd) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Campbell University is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arinderjit Dhali