This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2018 at 06:36:14 (UTC).

Jones v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Jones

Defendants

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel John Carr

Attorney at Peiffer Rosca Wolf Abdullah Carr & Kane PLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 4610

New Orleans, LA 70170

Laurin M. Jacobsen

Attorney at Peiffer Rosca Wolf Abdullah Carr & Kane -LA

Suite 4610, 201 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Defendant Attorneys

Lawton Cole Callihan

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP - New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

E. Paige Sensenbrenner

Attorney at Adams and Reese LLP - New Orleans

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:17-cv-12986. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/copy of docket sheet to non-registered attorneys. (Entered: 02/23/2018)

9 #1

Transmittal Letter

#9

(#9) Order of MDL Transfer to Eastern District of Kentucky. MDL case number is 2809. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(jls) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 02/23/2018)

#8

(#8) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2809. (jls) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 02/23/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #5 motion is GRANTED. Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP shall file responsive pleadings by 2/26/2018. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 2/1/2018. (jls) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 1/31/2018.(ajn) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party Bristol-Myers Squibb Company(pty:dft).(Callihan, Lawton) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP on 12/5/2017, answer due 2/5/2018. (Carr, Daniel) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 12/5/2017, answer due 2/5/2018. (Carr, Daniel) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6485137) filed by Mark Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Daniel J. Carr added to party Mark Jones(pty:pla).(Carr, Daniel) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 11/21/2017)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (MRS) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (MRS) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:17-cv-12986. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/copy of docket sheet to non-registered attorneys. (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order of MDL Transfer to Eastern District of Kentucky. MDL case number is 2809. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(jls) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2809. (jls) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #5 motion is GRANTED. Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP shall file responsive pleadings by 2/26/2018. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 2/1/2018. (jls) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 1/31/2018.(ajn) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party Bristol-Myers Squibb Company(pty:dft).(Callihan, Lawton) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP on 12/5/2017, answer due 2/5/2018. (Carr, Daniel) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 12/5/2017, answer due 2/5/2018. (Carr, Daniel) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6485137) filed by Mark Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Daniel J. Carr added to party Mark Jones(pty:pla).(Carr, Daniel) [Transferred from laed on 2/23/2018.] (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less