This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:49:24 (UTC).

Jones v. Arbuckle et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Arbuckle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and S Maurice Hicks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01197

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan K Jones

Defendants

Jayson Richardson

Courtney Dowden

Rodney Arbuckle

Monica Cason

Adam Ewing

John Clements

James Clements

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pamela R Jones

Attorney at Downer Jones et al

401 Market St Ste 1250

Shreveport, LA 71101

Defendant Attorneys

Gregg A Wilkes

Attorney at Cook Yancey et al

P O Box 22260

Shreveport, LA 71120-2260

Jason Blance Nichols

Attorney at Cook Yancey et al

P O Box 22260

Shreveport, LA 71120-2260

James R Sterritt

Attorney at Cook Yancey et al

P O Box 22260

Shreveport, LA 71120-2260

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension Time to Obtain Counsel. Mr. Dowden is granted an extension of time to obtain counsel and file an answer no later than December 7, 2018. Compliance Deadline set for 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/9/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION FOR EXTENSION of to Obtain Counsel by Courtney Dowden. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time allowed defendants Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, James Clements, Adam Ewing and Jayson Richardson to file their answer, other responsive pleadings, or otherwise defend this action be and it is extended for a period of thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan K Jones. Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Adam Ewing and Jayson Richardson served on 10/12/2018 and their answer is due 11/2/2018; Courtney Dowden served on 10/19/2018 and answer is due 11/19/2018. (aty,Jones, Pamela) Modified on 10/26/2018 to name parties served, date served and answer due (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

5 #1

Proposed order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint with consent by Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, James Clements, Adam Ewing, Jayson Richardson. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney James R Sterritt added to party Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Adam Ewing, Jayson Richardson(pty:dft))(aty,Sterritt, James) Modified on 10/26/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P). Modified on 10/26/2018 to edit filers (Reeves, T). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Courtney Dowden, Adam Ewing, and Jayson Richardson with Jury Demand filed by Ryan K Jones.(aty,Jones, Pamela) Modified docket text on 9/13/2018 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Courtney Dowden, Adam Ewing, Jayson Richardson (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Courtney Dowden, Adam Ewing, Jayson Richardson with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3750578) filed by Ryan K Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Pamela R Jones added to party Ryan K Jones(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Pamela) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension Time to Obtain Counsel. Mr. Dowden is granted an extension of time to obtain counsel and file an answer no later than December 7, 2018. Compliance Deadline set for 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/9/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION FOR EXTENSION of to Obtain Counsel by Courtney Dowden. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time allowed defendants Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, James Clements, Adam Ewing and Jayson Richardson to file their answer, other responsive pleadings, or otherwise defend this action be and it is extended for a period of thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan K Jones. Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Adam Ewing and Jayson Richardson served on 10/12/2018 and their answer is due 11/2/2018; Courtney Dowden served on 10/19/2018 and answer is due 11/19/2018. (aty,Jones, Pamela) Modified on 10/26/2018 to name parties served, date served and answer due (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint with consent by Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, James Clements, Adam Ewing, Jayson Richardson. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney James R Sterritt added to party Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Adam Ewing, Jayson Richardson(pty:dft))(aty,Sterritt, James) Modified on 10/26/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P). Modified on 10/26/2018 to edit filers (Reeves, T). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Hornsby on 9/13/2018. (crt,Guin, P.) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Courtney Dowden, Adam Ewing, and Jayson Richardson with Jury Demand filed by Ryan K Jones.(aty,Jones, Pamela) Modified docket text on 9/13/2018 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Courtney Dowden, Adam Ewing, Jayson Richardson (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Rodney Arbuckle, Monica Cason, John Clements, Courtney Dowden, Adam Ewing, Jayson Richardson with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3750578) filed by Ryan K Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Pamela R Jones added to party Ryan K Jones(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Pamela) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pamela R Jones