This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2018 at 07:54:48 (UTC).

Jones v. Allstate Indemnity Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 Jones filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00164

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Jones

Defendants

Allstate Indemnity Company

Jeffrey M. Daniels

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Bradford Summers

3301 Dudley Avenue

Parkersburg, WV 26104

Defendant Attorneys

Brent K. Kesner

Attorney at Kesner & Kesner PLLC

112 Capitol Street, Po Box 2587

Charleston, WV 25329

Tanya M. Kesner

Attorney at Kesner & Kesner PLLC

112 Capitol Street, Po Box 2587

Charleston, WV 25329

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

11 #1

Exhibit exhibit 1 and exhibit 2

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Daniel Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit 1 and exhibit 2)(Summers, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

10 #3

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

10 #2

Service of Process

10 #1

Cover Sheet

#10

(#10) CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Marion County. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Service of Process, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (wrr) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court grants the Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Responses due by 9/24/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/20/18. (mh) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Daniel Jones. (Summers, William) Modified on 9/20/2018 (mh) (Pending Motion terminated as this document is a proposed order). NEF regen (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Daniel Jones. (Summers, William) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM by Allstate Indemnity Company re #3 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#2

(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/16/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2018 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 11/20/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/22/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Consent to Notice of Removal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Daniel Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit 1 and exhibit 2)(Summers, William) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Marion County. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Service of Process, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (wrr) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court grants the Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Responses due by 9/24/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/20/18. (mh) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Daniel Jones. (Summers, William) Modified on 9/20/2018 (mh) (Pending Motion terminated as this document is a proposed order). NEF regen (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Daniel Jones. (Summers, William) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM by Allstate Indemnity Company re #3 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kesner, Brent) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/16/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2018 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 11/20/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/22/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marion County, WV, (case number 18-C-55), filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2650705 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less