This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 08:03:47 (UTC).

Jones v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Jones filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01023

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Special Agent Larry Jones

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Larry Jones

Defendant

Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James S. Holt

Attorney at Holt Law Firm

4720 North Boulevard

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Defendant Attorneys

Christina M. Seanor

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

188 E. Capitol Street, Suite 400

Jackson, MS 39201

Blake Goodsell

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) NOTICE of Signed Civil Cover Sheet by Larry Jones re 3 Order, #1 Complaint, (Holt, James) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/27/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/27/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#2

(#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/20/2018. (BLR) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Signed Civil Cover Sheet by Larry Jones re 3 Order, #1 Complaint, (Holt, James) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/27/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/27/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Jones . Caliber Home Loans, Inc. served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Holt, James) Modified on 12/6/2018 to edit the text (SWE). Modified to include answer due date on 12/27/2018 (BLR). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#6

(#9) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Entry of Default. Defendant's counsel filed a #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings on 12/21/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#7

(#9) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Entry of Default. Defendant's counsel filed a #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings on 12/21/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

7 #1

Affidavit Exhibit A: Affidavit of Jim Holt for Entry of Default Judgment

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Return of Service

#17

(#17) Joint STATUS REPORT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LSF6 Service Operations, LLC, Corporate Parent LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Caliber Home Loans, Inc. for Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

15 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

13 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#15

(#15) MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

12 #1

Exhibit Order

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time Status Report by Larry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Holt, James) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint STATUS REPORT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LSF6 Service Operations, LLC, Corporate Parent LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Caliber Home Loans, Inc. for Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Seanor, Christina) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time Status Report by Larry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Holt, James) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Christina M. Seanor for Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Enroll Christina M. Seanor as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Enroll Christina M. Seanor as Additional Attorney by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order for Motion to Appear as Additional Counsel)(Goodsell, Blake) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Entry of Default. Defendant's counsel filed a #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings on 12/21/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Caliber Home Loans, Inc. responsive pleadings due 1/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) First MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc. by Larry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A: Affidavit of Jim Holt for Entry of Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Return of Service)(Holt, James) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Goodsell, Blake) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Jones . Caliber Home Loans, Inc. served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Holt, James) Modified on 12/6/2018 to edit the text (SWE). Modified to include answer due date on 12/27/2018 (BLR). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Signed Civil Cover Sheet by Larry Jones re 3 Order, #1 Complaint, (Holt, James) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/27/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/27/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • (#3) ORDER: A review of the docket indicates that the Civil Cover Sheet (R. Doc. 1-2) is not signed. Plaintiff is ordered to file a signed Civil Cover Sheet by 11/30/18 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/26/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/20/2018. (BLR) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1863730.), filed by Larry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Holt, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/19/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). Modified on 11/27/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.