This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 07:43:00 (UTC).

Johnson v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 Johnson filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02644

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramon Johnson

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Shapiro & Ingle, LLP

Not Classified By Court

Donna L. Russell

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ted I. Jones

Attorney at JONES & GARRETT LAW FIRM

2670 Union Avenue Extended, Suite 1200

Memphis, TN 38112

Defendant Attorneys

Reid S. Manley

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Ste. 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Samuel Aitken Morris

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

222 Second Avenue South, Suite 2000

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/18. (Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/18. (Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/18. (Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ramon Johnson. (Jones, Ted) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#14

(#14) SETTING LETTER: Non-Jury Trial is set for Monday, 9/23/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 9/13/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 9/4/2019. (jrs) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ramon Johnson. (Jones, Ted) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#11

(#11) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is reset for Monday, 10/29/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Scheduling Order submitted to the Judge). (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Aitken Morris on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

8 #2

Exhibit 1 - Note

8 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#8

(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Note)(Manley, Reid) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#7

(#7) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 10/24/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#3

(#3) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank N.A... (Manley, Reid) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B - State Court Filings

1 #2

Exhibit A - Consent to Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. from Shelby Chancery, case number CH-18-1137 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2884131), filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Filings)(Manley, Reid) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/18. (Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/18. (Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/18. (Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ramon Johnson. (Jones, Ted) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SETTING LETTER: Non-Jury Trial is set for Monday, 9/23/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 9/13/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 9/4/2019. (jrs) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • (#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/2018. Non-Jury Trial is set for Monday, 9/23/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 1-2 days. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 9/13/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 9/4/2019. (Court Reporter: Nicole Warren) (jrs) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ramon Johnson. (Jones, Ted) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is reset for Monday, 10/29/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Scheduling Order submitted to the Judge). (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Aitken Morris on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Note)(Manley, Reid) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 10/24/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank N.A... (Manley, Reid) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. from Shelby Chancery, case number CH-18-1137 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2884131), filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Filings)(Manley, Reid) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less