This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2019 at 07:59:33 (UTC).

Johnson v. ICE et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 Johnson filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against ICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H L Perez-Montes and Dee D Drell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01484

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

Presiding Judge

Dee D Drell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vaughn Johnson

Trout, LA 71371

Defendants

R B P F Inter-agencies

I C E

U S C I S

 

Court Documents

#17

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #22 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/4/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Take Judicial Notice of Pertinent District Court Cases by Vaughn Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The Court takes note of Petitioner's new address. Petitioner's remaining requests for relief are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/17/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #18 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/17/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Apprise Court of new address and to Incorporate Bill of Rights, Constitutional, Non-Detention Act, Statutory Privacy Act, 1st, 4th, 5th, 6th, and 14th Amendment Fundamental Procedural Safeguard Equal Protection Due Process Clause Crisis Concerns Violations by Vaughn Johnson. (Plaintiff's address previously updated to Etowah County Jail.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave to File an Instant Addendum Order to Take Judicial Notice for Relief to Incorporate Substantive Prejudice into Petitioner's Complaint by Vaughn Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Vaughn Johnson, LaSalle Detention Facility P O Box 560 Trout, LA 71371, re: 13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief returned marked: Return to Sender, no longer here. Clerk resent to plaintiff at Etowah County Jail (crt,Haik, K) Modified to indicate clerk resent document to plaintiff at current address on 12/17/2018 (Haik, K). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion for Leave. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED. Petitioner's remaining requests for relief are denied as premature or unwarranted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/12/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Vaughn Johnson, LaSalle Detention Facility P O Box 560 Trout, LA 71371, re: #12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis returned marked: Return to Sender. Action taken: Clerk resent to Plaintiff at Etowah County Jail, 827 Forrest Ave, Gadsden, AL 35901. (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to File Instant Addendum to Memorandum Order; to Retain Subject Matter Jurisdiction and to Take Judicial Notice by Vaughn Johnson. (Plaintiff's address updated to Etowah County Jail on 12/7/18.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vaughn Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Vaughn Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 2241 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/15/2018. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01871. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER - At the time he brought this petition, Johnson was confined in La Salle Parish, Louisiana, which is located in the Western District of Louisiana. This court lacks jurisdiction over Johnsons immediate custodian, and thus over his petition. Accordingly, this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/14/2018. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 11/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vaughn Johnson. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 11/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Vaughn Johnson.(KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 11/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.