This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2018 at 07:36:59 (UTC).

Johnson v. Humphreys et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Humphreys. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James M. Moody Jr. and Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00535

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James M. Moody Jr.

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lott Johnson

Defendants

UPS Ground Freight Inc

Cheryl Humphreys

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luther Oneal Sutter

Attorney at Sutter & Gillham, PLLC

Post Office Box 2012

Benton, AR 72018

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel K. O'Toole

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Michael J. Emerson

Attorney at Barber Law Firm PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3400

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER granting in part #18 Plaintiff Lott Johnson's amended motion to stay. This case will not be stayed pending resolution of #11 the motion to remand, but Johnson shall have 14 days from the date of this order to respond to #13 the pending motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/9/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#18

(#18) Amended MOTION to Stay by Lott Johnson (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time by Lott Johnson (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by UPS Ground Freight Inc. (O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#14

(#14) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by UPS Ground Freight Inc. (O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by UPS Ground Freight Inc (O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#12

(#12) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Remand to State Court filed by Lott Johnson. (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 09/16/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lott Johnson (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 09/16/2018)

#10

(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/24/2018. Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/7/2018. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/5/2019 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/27/18. (lp) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER directing the Clerk to assign this action to another Judge. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/17/2018. (mcz) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by UPS Ground Freight Inc (O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

6 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 8

6 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7

6 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by UPS Ground Freight Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Lott Johnson. (ljb) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting in part #18 Plaintiff Lott Johnson's amended motion to stay. This case will not be stayed pending resolution of #11 the motion to remand, but Johnson shall have 14 days from the date of this order to respond to #13 the pending motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/9/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Amended MOTION to Stay by Lott Johnson (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #16 motion to stay or, in the alternative, for an extension of time because it fails to comply with Local Rule 6.2(b). Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/05/2018.(sj) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time by Lott Johnson (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by UPS Ground Freight Inc. (O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by UPS Ground Freight Inc. (O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by UPS Ground Freight Inc (O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Remand to State Court filed by Lott Johnson. (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 09/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lott Johnson (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 09/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/24/2018. Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/7/2018. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/5/2019 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/27/18. (lp) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #8 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER directing the Clerk to assign this action to another Judge. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/17/2018. (mcz) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by UPS Ground Freight Inc (O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by UPS Ground Freight Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(O'Toole, Daniel) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Cheryl Humphreys. (ljb) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cheryl Humphreys. (ljb) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Lott Johnson. (ljb) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Lott Johnson. (ljb) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UPS Ground Freight Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-18-2417. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT068408. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less