Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2018 at 08:03:16 (UTC).

Johnson v. Ethicon, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Dowdell and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00421

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janelle Johnson

Defendant

Ethicon, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Telhiard Boudreaux

Attorney at Richardson Richardson Boudreaux

7447 S Lewis Ave

Tulsa, OK 74136

Defendant Attorney

Amy Sherry-Fischer

Attorney at Foliart Huff Ottaway & Bottom

201 Robert S Kerr Ave 12Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Janelle Johnson (Boudreaux, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/24/2018) (SAS, Chambers) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon, Inc.) by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#5

(#5) JURY DEMAND by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry-Fischer on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#3

(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

2 #10

Exhibit 10-Docket Sheet

2 #9

Exhibit 9-Return of Service for Ethicon, Inc.

2 #8

Exhibit 8-Summons to Ethicon, Inc.

2 #7

Exhibit 7-Boudreaux v. DaimlerChrysler Corp.

2 #6

Exhibit 6-Cole v. Medtronic Inc.

2 #5

Exhibit 5-Hammarlund v. CR Bard

2 #4

Exhibit 4-CAH Acquisition v. Health Care Service

2 #3

Exhibit 3-Partin v. Marmic Fire and Safety

2 #2

Exhibit 2-Three RP v. Dicks Sporting Goods

2 #1

Exhibit 1-Petition

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #11 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Janelle Johnson (Boudreaux, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/24/2018) (SAS, Chambers) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ethicon, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon, Inc.) by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JURY DEMAND by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry-Fischer on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2018-03136 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1948824) by Ethicon, Inc. (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ethicon, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Ethicon, Inc. by Janelle Johnson (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Sherry-Fischer