This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2018 at 08:01:16 (UTC).

Johnson et al v. Liberty County, Georgia et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Liberty County, Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are G. R. Smith, Lisa G. Wood and James E. Graham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00216

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

Referral Judges

G. R. Smith

James E. Graham

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

B.E.J. III

Elvira Lowman

Bernard E. Johnson, Jr.

Defendants

Deputy M. Gary Richardson

Liberty County, Georgia

Liberty County Sheriff's Department

Glenn Wilson

Liberty County School District and Board of Education

Sheriff Steve C. Sikes

Warnella Wilder

Janelle Charlery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyler Lee Randolph

Attorney at Tyler Lee Randolph, PC

P.O. Box 1419

Richmond Hill, GA 31324

Defendant Attorneys

Sun S. Choy

Attorney at Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Pkwy., Se, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

Wesley Calvin Jackson

Attorney at Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Pkwy., Se, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION to Stay Discovery and Brief in Support by Liberty County Sheriff's Department, Liberty County, Georgia, M. Gary Richardson, Steve C. Sikes. Responses due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Wesley) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Liberty County Sheriff's Department, Liberty County, Georgia, M. Gary Richardson, Steve C. Sikes. Responses due by 11/19/2018. (Jackson, Wesley) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Liberty County Sheriff's Department answer due 11/5/2018; Liberty County, Georgia answer due 11/5/2018; M. Gary Richardson answer due 11/5/2018; Steve C. Sikes answer due 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/16/18. (trb) Modified on 10/18/2018 (ca). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Calvin Jackson on behalf of Liberty County Sheriff's Department, Liberty County, Georgia, M. Gary Richardson, Steve C. Sikes (Jackson, Wesley) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Liberty County Sheriff's Department, Liberty County, Georgia, M. Gary Richardson, Steve C. Sikes. Responses due by 10/26/2018. (Choy, Sun) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

4 #7

Proof of Service upon Defendant Glenn Wilson

4 #6

Proof of Service upon Defendant Deputy M. Gary Richardson

4 #5

Proof of Service upon Defendant Warnella Wilder

4 #4

Proof of Service upon Defendant Liberty County Sheriff Steve C. Sikes

4 #3

Proof of Service upon Defendant Liberty County Sheriff's Department

4 #2

Proof of Service upon Defendants Liberty County School District and Board of Ed

4 #1

Proof of Service upon Defendant Liberty County

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Liberty Co., Liberty Co. School District & Board, Liberty Co. Sheriff's Dep't, Deputy M. Gary Richardson, Sheriff Steve C. Sikes, Warnella Wilder, Glenn Wilson on 09/24/2018, filed by B.E.J. III, Bernard E. Johnson, Jr, Elvira Lowman. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service upon Defendant Liberty County, #2 Proof of Service upon Defendants Liberty County School District and Board of Education, #3 Proof of Service upon Defendant Liberty County Sheriff's Department, #4 Proof of Service upon Defendant Liberty County Sheriff Steve C. Sikes, #5 Proof of Service upon Defendant Warnella Wilder, #6 Proof of Service upon Defendant Deputy M. Gary Richardson, #7 Proof of Service upon Defendant Glenn Wilson)(Randolph, Tyler) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jrb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

2 #1

Litigants' Bill of Rights

#2

(#2) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/13/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Brief in Support. (trb) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Stay Discovery and Brief in Support by Liberty County Sheriff's Department, Liberty County, Georgia, M. Gary Richardson, Steve C. Sikes. Responses due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Wesley) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Liberty County Sheriff's Department, Liberty County, Georgia, M. Gary Richardson, Steve C. Sikes. Responses due by 11/19/2018. (Jackson, Wesley) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Liberty County Sheriff's Department answer due 11/5/2018; Liberty County, Georgia answer due 11/5/2018; M. Gary Richardson answer due 11/5/2018; Steve C. Sikes answer due 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/16/18. (trb) Modified on 10/18/2018 (ca). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (slt) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (trb) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Calvin Jackson on behalf of Liberty County Sheriff's Department, Liberty County, Georgia, M. Gary Richardson, Steve C. Sikes (Jackson, Wesley) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Liberty County Sheriff's Department, Liberty County, Georgia, M. Gary Richardson, Steve C. Sikes. Responses due by 10/26/2018. (Choy, Sun) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (trb) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Liberty Co., Liberty Co. School District & Board, Liberty Co. Sheriff's Dep't, Deputy M. Gary Richardson, Sheriff Steve C. Sikes, Warnella Wilder, Glenn Wilson on 09/24/2018, filed by B.E.J. III, Bernard E. Johnson, Jr, Elvira Lowman. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service upon Defendant Liberty County, #2 Proof of Service upon Defendants Liberty County School District and Board of Education, #3 Proof of Service upon Defendant Liberty County Sheriff's Department, #4 Proof of Service upon Defendant Liberty County Sheriff Steve C. Sikes, #5 Proof of Service upon Defendant Warnella Wilder, #6 Proof of Service upon Defendant Deputy M. Gary Richardson, #7 Proof of Service upon Defendant Glenn Wilson)(Randolph, Tyler) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jrb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/13/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by B.E.J. III, Elvira Lowman, Bernard E. Johnson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2446163. (jrb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less