This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 08:06:20 (UTC).

Coleman v. Hogan et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Coleman filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Hogan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00197

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnny Ray Coleman

Jonesborough, TN 37659

Defendants

Craig Henderson

Bob Hogan

Cocke County Jail

Jason Phillips

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #1 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Plaintiff is an inmate, he is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to the custodian of inmate accounts at the institution where Plaintiff is now confined. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the Court's financial deputy. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on January 14, 2019. (copy mailed to Johnny Ray Coleman #52912074, SWVRJA,P. O. Box 280, Meadowview, VA 24361 and to Warden of Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority) (AYB) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnny Ray Coleman. Address updated from WASHINGTON COUNTY, DETENTION CENTER, PO BOX 97, JONESBOROUGH, TN 37659 to SWVRJA, P.O. Box 280, Meadowview, VA 24361 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

5 #2

Other Envelope

5 #1

Other Copy Request Notice

#5

(#5) Letter from Johnny Ray Coleman requesting copies of local rules and forms. (Attachments: #1 Copy Request Notice, #2 Envelope) (Copy request notice mailed to Johnny Ray Coleman)(JCK) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

4 #1

Other Envelope

#4

(#4) Letter from Johnny Ray Coleman acknowledging receipt of Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Johnny Ray Coleman) (CAT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

2 #1

Other Envelope

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Cocke County Jail, Craig Henderson, Bob Hogan, Jason Phillips (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Johnny Ray Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #4

Other Second Envelope

1 #2

Other First envelope

1 #1

Other Certificate of Inmate Account

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny Ray Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 First envelope, #3 Additional Account Certification Information, #4 Second Envelope) (CAT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #1 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Plaintiff is an inmate, he is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to the custodian of inmate accounts at the institution where Plaintiff is now confined. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the Court's financial deputy. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on January 14, 2019. (copy mailed to Johnny Ray Coleman #52912074, SWVRJA,P. O. Box 280, Meadowview, VA 24361 and to Warden of Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority) (AYB) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnny Ray Coleman. Address updated from WASHINGTON COUNTY, DETENTION CENTER, PO BOX 97, JONESBOROUGH, TN 37659 to SWVRJA, P.O. Box 280, Meadowview, VA 24361 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Johnny Ray Coleman requesting copies of local rules and forms. (Attachments: #1 Copy Request Notice, #2 Envelope) (Copy request notice mailed to Johnny Ray Coleman)(JCK) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Johnny Ray Coleman acknowledging receipt of Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Johnny Ray Coleman) (CAT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Cocke County Jail, Craig Henderson, Bob Hogan, Jason Phillips (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Johnny Ray Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny Ray Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 First envelope, #3 Additional Account Certification Information, #4 Second Envelope) (CAT) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.