This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2019 at 07:12:56 (UTC).

Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. v. Rolf Lovland, et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Rolf Lovland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Suzanne H. Segal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-10009

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Suzanne H. Segal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD

Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd.

Defendants

UMG Recordings, Inc.

BRENDAN GRAHAM

Spotify Technology S.A.

Peermusic Ltd

Universal Music Publishing Group

Apple Inc

Warner Music Group

ROLF LOVLAND

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Machat

Attorney at Machat and Associates PC

8730 Sunset Boulevard Suite 250

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Defendant Attorneys

Tal E Dickstein

Attorney at Loeb and Loeb LLP

345 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10154

Barry Isaac Slotnick

Attorney at Loeb and Loeb LLP

345 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10154-1895

Ava Badiee

Attorney at Leob and Loeb LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Bobby A Ghajar

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1333 2Nd Street Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401-4100

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Warner Music Group answer now due 2/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Warner Music Group.(Attorney Ava Badiee added to party Warner Music Group(pty:dft))(Badiee, Ava) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Barry I. Slotnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Peermusic, Ltd, Universal Music Publishing Group, and UMG Recordings, Inc., designating Ava Badiee as local counsel #13 . (gk) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Tal E. Dickstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Peermusic, Ltd, Universal Music Publishing Group, and UMG Recordings, Inc., designating Ava Badiee as local counsel #12 . (gk) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barry I. Slotnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Peermusic Ltd, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23002102) filed by Defendants Peermusic Ltd, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Badiee, Ava) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tal E. Dickstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Peermusic Ltd, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23002006) filed by Defendants Peermusic Ltd, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Badiee, Ava) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apple Inc answer now due 2/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Apple Inc.(Attorney Bobby A Ghajar added to party Apple Inc(pty:dft))(Ghajar, Bobby) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UMG Recordings, Inc. answer now due 2/7/2019; Peermusic Ltd answer now due 2/7/2019; Universal Music Publishing Group answer now due 2/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants UMG Recordings, Inc.; Peermusic Ltd; Universal Music Publishing Group.(Attorney Ava Badiee added to party Peermusic Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Ava Badiee added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ava Badiee added to party Universal Music Publishing Group(pty:dft))(Badiee, Ava) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-10009 AB (SSx). (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Apple Inc, Brendan Graham, Rolf Lovland, Peermusic Ltd, Spotify Technology S.A., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group, Warner Music Group. (lh) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD. (Machat, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD, identifying Johann Helgason, JohannSongs-Publishing, Ltd., Rolf Lovland, Brendan Graham, Peermusic, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group, Warner Music Group, UMG Recordings, Inc., Apple, Inc., Spotify Technology S.A., Vivendi. (Machat, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD. (Machat, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22821546 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD. (Attorney Michael Machat added to party JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD(pty:pla))(Machat, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spotify Technology S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Peermusic III, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. is a litigant