This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2019 at 07:44:06 (UTC).

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Hobbs et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Joe Hand Promotions, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Hobbs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.

Defendants

Timothy E. Poe

Carrie S. Hobbs

Susey and Tim, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryce A. Lenox

Attorney at Law Office of Bryce A. Lenox, Esq. LLC

3825 Smith Edwards Road, Suite 103

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Defendant Attorney

Leigh Gross Latherow

Attorney at VanAntwerp Attorneys, LLP

1544 Winchester Avenue, Fifth Floor, Suite 500, P.O. Box 1111

Ashland, KY 41105-1111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including February 17, 2019, to file responsive pleading #11 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/17/19.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 01/17/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Carrie S. Hobbs(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill), Timothy E. Poe(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill), Susey and Tim, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Latherow, Leigh) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. via Personal to Carrie S. Hobbs(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill) served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Carrie S. Hobbs(Individually) served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. via Personal to Susey and Tim, LLC served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. via Personal to Timothy E. Poe(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill) served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Timothy E. Poe(Individually) served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by Bryce A. Lenox (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#6

(#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (KSS) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#5

(#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Bryce A. Lenox. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Carrie S. Hobbs(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill), Carrie S. Hobbs(Individually), Timothy E. Poe(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill), Timothy E. Poe(Individually), Susey and Tim, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

1 #4

Summons Timothy E. Poe

1 #3

Summons Carrie Hobbs

1 #2

Summons Riverbend Pub & Grill

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4241710), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Riverbend Pub & Grill, #3 Proposed Summons Carrie Hobbs, #4 Proposed Summons Timothy E. Poe)(JLS) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including February 17, 2019, to file responsive pleading #11 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/17/19.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Carrie S. Hobbs(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill), Timothy E. Poe(as Officers, Directors, Shareho (JLS) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Carrie S. Hobbs(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill), Timothy E. Poe(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill), Susey and Tim, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Latherow, Leigh) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. via Personal to Carrie S. Hobbs(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill) served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Carrie S. Hobbs(Individually) served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. via Personal to Susey and Tim, LLC served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. via Personal to Timothy E. Poe(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill) served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Timothy E. Poe(Individually) served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by Bryce A. Lenox (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (KSS) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lenox, Bryce) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Bryce A. Lenox. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Carrie S. Hobbs(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill), Carrie S. Hobbs(Individually), Timothy E. Poe(as Officers, Directors, Shareholders, Members and/or Principals of Susey and Tim, LLC, d/b/a Riverbend Pub & Grill), Timothy E. Poe(Individually), Susey and Tim, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (JLS) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4241710), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Riverbend Pub & Grill, #3 Proposed Summons Carrie Hobbs, #4 Proposed Summons Timothy E. Poe)(JLS) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.