This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:34:39 (UTC).

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Garcia

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Joe Hand Promotions, Inc filed an Other - Communication lawsuit against Garcia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Communication

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.

Defendant

Yesenia M. Garcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamie Renee King

Attorney at Jamie King, P.C.

Po Box 5757

Kingwood, TX 77325

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, 6) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Yesenia M. Garcia, filed.(King, Jamie) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20740154) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed.(King, Jamie) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed.(King, Jamie) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Yesenia M. Garcia. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail. (yhausmann, 6) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, 6) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Yesenia M. Garcia, filed.(King, Jamie) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20740154) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.