Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2018 at 05:56:51 (UTC).

Jesus Perez v. CRST International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 Jesus Perez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CRST International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney and Linda R Reade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Linda R Reade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesus Perez

Defendants

Does 1-100, inclusive

CRST International, Inc

CRST Expedited, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael S Morrison

Attorney at Alexander Krakow and Glick LLP

401 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1000

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Jessica Sun Choi

Attorney at Alexander Krakow and Glick LLP

401 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1000

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Nicolas Orihuela

Attorney at Hurwitz Orihuela and Hayes LLP

5757 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 503

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorneys

Megan Emslie Ross

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary LLP

2 North Lake Avenue Suite 560

Pasadena, CA 91101

Adam J Eakman

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary PC

10 West Market Street Suite 1400

Indianapolis, MN 46204

Charles Andrewscavage

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary PC

30 West Monroe Street Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60603

Christopher Chad McNatt, Jr

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary LLP

2 North Lake Avenue Suite 560

Pasadena, CA 91101

James H Hanson

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary PC

10 West Market Street Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

R Jay Taylor, Jr

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary PC

10 West Market Street Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) DOCKET Annotation: Please find new removal case packet attached. (e-mailed to all counsel of record) (mml) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

#37

(#37) NOTICE to Attorneys Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. If you do not satisfy these requirements within 14 days from the date of this Notice, you will be terminated from the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/14/2018. (e-mailed to all attorneys of record with CM-ECF sign up form) (mml) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

36 #1

*Restricted*

#36

(#36) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:17-cv-01081. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 2/14/2018 (mml). NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (Entered: 02/14/2018)

#35

(#35) MINUTE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DOC. NO. 31) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting #31 MOTION to Transfer Case: For the reasons stated above, the Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer the action to the Northern District of Iowa. (see document for further details) MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 02/14/2018)

31 #3

Proposed Order

31 #2

Exhibit A-Declaration of Michael Gannon

31 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Motion to Transfer

#31

(#31) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa filed by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit A-Declaration of Michael Gannon, #3 Proposed Order) (Hanson, James) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/15/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dolly M. Gee. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-01081-DMG (PLAx). (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Paul L. Abrams. New Case Number 5:17-cv-01081-JGB (PLAx). (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., (Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

1 #4

Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit B - Declaration of Lori Pasker

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings (Part 2)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings (Part 1)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC1705858 Receipt No: 0973-19935457 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings (Part 2), #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lori Pasker, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal) (Attorney Megan Emslie Ross added to party CRST Expedited, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Megan Emslie Ross added to party CRST International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) DOCKET Annotation: Please find new removal case packet attached. (e-mailed to all counsel of record) (mml) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Set Deadline: Defendants CRST International, Inc., and CRST Expedited, Inc.'s LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/16/2018. (e-mailed NEF to all counsel of record) (mml) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE to Attorneys Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. If you do not satisfy these requirements within 14 days from the date of this Notice, you will be terminated from the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/14/2018. (e-mailed to all attorneys of record with CM-ECF sign up form) (mml) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:17-cv-01081. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 2/14/2018 (mml). NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MINUTE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DOC. NO. 31) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting #31 MOTION to Transfer Case: For the reasons stated above, the Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer the action to the Northern District of Iowa. (see document for further details) MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE [DOC NO. 31] taking under submission #31 MOTION to Transfer Venue Hearing held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Matter called. Court issues a tentative ruling, hears oral argument and takes the matter under submission. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Myra L. Ponce. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa #31 filed by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Hanson, James) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Opposition In Oppositon re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa #31 filed by Plaintiff Jesus Perez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jesus Perez)(Morrison, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Iowa filed by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit A-Declaration of Michael Gannon, #3 Proposed Order) (Hanson, James) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #28 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Granting Non-Resident Attorney Charles Andrewscavage APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CRST International, Inc. and CRST Expedited, Inc., designating Christopher C. McNatt, Jr. as local counsel. (ab) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26 (f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee is set for hearing 7/14/2017 at 9:30 AM. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dolly M. Gee. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-01081-DMG (PLAx). (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Paul L. Abrams. New Case Number 5:17-cv-01081-JGB (PLAx). (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Class Action Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2](et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • NON-CONFORMED COPY OF CLASS ACTION FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., Does 1-100, inclusive amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Jesus Perez. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2](et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., Does 1-100, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Jesus Perez. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/5/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #1] (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc., (Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC1705858 Receipt No: 0973-19935457 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants CRST Expedited, Inc., CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings (Part 2), #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lori Pasker, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal) (Attorney Megan Emslie Ross added to party CRST Expedited, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Megan Emslie Ross added to party CRST International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ross, Megan) [Transferred from California Central on 2/14/2018.] (Entered: 05/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRST INTERNATIONAL INC. AN IOWA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CRST Expedited, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicolas Orihuela

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S Morrison