This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:33 (UTC).

Jester v. Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Jester filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04022

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent Jester

Defendants

John Doe B

Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.

John Doe D

John Doe A

Emerson Electric Co.

John Doe C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael C. Kendall

Attorney at Kendall Law Group, LLC

Suite 201, 3152 Golf Ridge Boulevard

Douglasville, GA 30135

Dennis Scott Mercer

Attorney at Kendall Law Group, LLC

Suite 201, 3152 Golf Ridge Boulevard

Douglasville, GA 30135

Maha Yousef Amircani

Attorney at Amircani Law, LLC

P.O. Box 905132

Atlanta, GA 30377

Jamison Blake Ledbetter

Attorney at Conoscienti Storm & Kendall

Suite 400, 315 W. Ponce De Leon Ave.

Decatur, GA 30030

Joseph A. Conoscienti

Attorney at Conoscienti & Ledbetter

Suite 400, 315 West Ponce De Leon Ave.

Decatur, GA 30030

Defendant Attorneys

Maxwell Kent Thelen

Attorney at The Summerville Firm, LLC

1201 Peachtree Street, Ne, 400 Colony Square, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30361

Christopher Cameron Yearout

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

The Clark Building, 400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Melody H. Eagan

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

The Clark Building, 400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Angela R. Fox

Attorney at The Summerville Firm, LLC

1201 Peachtree Street, Ne, 400 Colony Square, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30361

Adam K. Peck

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

The Clark Building, 400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

James Darren Summerville

Attorney at The Summerville Firm, LLC

1201 Peachtree Street, Ne, 400 Colony Square, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30361

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER regarding the parties' #15 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court grants the parties' request for an eight month discovery period, to conclude on May 24, 2019 and notes that no further extension will be permitted. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before June 24, 2019. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Court's ruling thereon. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/16/18. (ddm) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#16

(#16) Initial Disclosures by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co..(Yearout, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#15

(#15) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Vincent Jester. (Mercer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#14

(#14) Certificate of Interested Persons by Vincent Jester. (Mercer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#13

(#13) Initial Disclosures by Vincent Jester.(Mercer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until October 8, 2018 to file the Rule 26(f) Joint Preliminary Report and each party's respective Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/25/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until October 8, 2018 to file the Rule 26(f) Joint Preliminary Report and each party's respective Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/25/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co.. (Thelen, Maxwell) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Emerson Electric Co..(Thelen, Maxwell) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/24/2019.(Thelen, Maxwell) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Emerson Electric Co..(Thelen, Maxwell) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SCHEDULING ORDER regarding the parties' #15 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court grants the parties' request for an eight month discovery period, to conclude on May 24, 2019 and notes that no further extension will be permitted. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before June 24, 2019. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Court's ruling thereon. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/16/18. (ddm) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Initial Disclosures by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co..(Yearout, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Vincent Jester. (Mercer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Interested Persons by Vincent Jester. (Mercer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Initial Disclosures by Vincent Jester.(Mercer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Melody H. Eagan. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/28/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Adam K. Peck. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/28/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Christopher C. Yearout. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/28/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Melody H. Eagan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8162315). Attorney Melody H. Eagan added appearing on behalf of Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co. (pmb) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam K. Peck Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8162306). Attorney Adam K. Peck added appearing on behalf of Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co. (pmb) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher C. Yearout Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8162288). Attorney Christopher Cameron Yearout added appearing on behalf of Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co. (pmb) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until October 8, 2018 to file the Rule 26(f) Joint Preliminary Report and each party's respective Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/25/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Parties to File Mandatory Pleadings by Vincent Jester. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mercer, Dennis) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION for Admission of Melody H. Eagan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8162315)by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co.. (Fox, Angela) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Adam K. Peck Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8162306)by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co.. (Fox, Angela) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher C. Yearout Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8162288)by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co.. (Fox, Angela) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co.. (Thelen, Maxwell) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Emerson Electric Co..(Thelen, Maxwell) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/24/2019.(Thelen, Maxwell) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., Emerson Electric Co. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8101930) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less