This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2018 at 07:39:39 (UTC).

Jessup v. Anderson et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2018 Jessup filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James P. Mazzone and Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James P. Mazzone

Presiding Judge

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hunter Jessup

Martinsburg, WV 25401

Defendants

Kelly

C.O. Anderson

Flannigan

Carnello

The West Virginia Regional Jail Authority

Dixon

Zittmyer

Bean

Eastern Regional Jail

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/11/18. (lmm) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

8 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/6/18. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr w/PTAR) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice of General Guidelines #6 Notice of Deficient Pleading. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/2/18 per USPS. (lmm) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

6 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

5 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Claim 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hunter Jessup. (Attachments: #1 Claim 1, #2 Envelope)(lmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/11/18. (lmm) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/6/18. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr w/PTAR) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice of General Guidelines #6 Notice of Deficient Pleading. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/2/18 per USPS. (lmm) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Hunter Jessup. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Hunter Jessup. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hunter Jessup. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hunter Jessup. (Attachments: #1 Claim 1, #2 Envelope)(lmm) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.