This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2018 at 08:30:53 (UTC).

Jersey Subs, Inc. et al v. Sodexo America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 Jersey Subs, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sodexo America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Irene M. Keeley and Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00191

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Irene M. Keeley

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Jersey Subs, Inc.

Dana Papanicolas

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Lara Bealko

Sodexo America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Matthew Peter Crimmel

Attorney at Matthew P. Crimmel, Esq.

1042 Greystone Circle

Morgantown, WV 26508

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Adam Ketner Strider

Attorney at Bailey & Wyant, PLLC

500 Virginia Street E., Suite 600

Charleston, WV 25031

Justin C. Taylor

Attorney at Bailey & Wyant PLLC - Charleston

Po Box 3710, 500 Virginia Street, Suite 600

Charleston, WV 25337-3710

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lara Bealko, Sodexo America, LLC re #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Strider, Adam) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#19

(#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Strider, Adam) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

18 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#18

(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Remand filed by Lara Bealko, Sodexo America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Taylor, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Jersey Subs, Inc., Dana Papanicolas.(Crimmel, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#16

(#16) Docket entry inadvertently filed. NEF regen. (wrr) Modified on 11/1/2018 (cmd). (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/1/2018) (cmd). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

10 #1

Attachment Certification of Service

#10

(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Remand filed by Lara Bealko, Sodexo America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Taylor, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#4

(#17) ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Jersey Subs, Inc., Dana Papanicolas.(Crimmel, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#2

(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/16/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/4/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 11:30 AM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/10/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit State Court Documents

1 #5

Exhibit Letter to Circuit Clerk

1 #4

Exhibit Return Receipt for Bealko

1 #3

Exhibit Secretary of State Data Sodexo

1 #2

Exhibit Secretary of State Data JS&S

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, WV, (case number 18-C-373), filed by Lara Bealko, Sodexo America, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2682167. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Secretary of State Data JS&S, #3 Exhibit Secretary of State Data Sodexo, #4 Exhibit Return Receipt for Bealko, #5 Exhibit Letter to Circuit Clerk, #6 Exhibit State Court Documents, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2018
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 11:30 AM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. (cmd) (Entered: 12/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • (#21) Case Reassigned to District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh per Order entered 11/30/2018 in case 3:18mc128. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to the case. (cmd) (Entered: 12/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lara Bealko, Sodexo America, LLC re #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Strider, Adam) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Strider, Adam) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Remand filed by Lara Bealko, Sodexo America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Taylor, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Jersey Subs, Inc., Dana Papanicolas.(Crimmel, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Docket entry inadvertently filed. NEF regen. (wrr) Modified on 11/1/2018 (cmd). (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/1/2018) (cmd). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dana Papanicolas. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service for Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Crimmel, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dana Papanicolas. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service for Motion to Opposition to Mootion to Dismiss)(Crimmel, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jersey Subs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Motion to Dismiss)(Crimmel, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) First MOTION to Remand by Jersey Subs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certification of Service)(Crimmel, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Exhibit Other Document re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sodexo America, LLC. (Taylor, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM In Support by Sodexo America, LLC re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (Taylor, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Sodexo America, LLC. (Taylor, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM In Support by Lara Bealko re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Taylor, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Lara Bealko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Taylor, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jersey Subs, Inc., Dana Papanicolas by Lara Bealko, Sodexo America, LLC.(Taylor, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Monongalia County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summonses, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Civil Case Information Sheet, #5 Notice of Filing of Removal). (wrr) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/16/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/4/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 11:30 AM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/10/2018. (wrr) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, WV, (case number 18-C-373), filed by Lara Bealko, Sodexo America, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2682167. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Secretary of State Data JS&S, #3 Exhibit Secretary of State Data Sodexo, #4 Exhibit Return Receipt for Bealko, #5 Exhibit Letter to Circuit Clerk, #6 Exhibit State Court Documents, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.