This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2019 at 07:53:20 (UTC).

Jeranian et al v. Dermenjian

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 Jeranian filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Dermenjian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00652

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank North

David S. Jeranian

Defendants

Joyce A Dermenjian

Belmont, MA 02478

Joyce A. Jeranian

Belmont, MA 02478

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David E. Maglio

Attorney at David E. Maglio & Associates, P.C.

The Owen Building, 101 Dyer St., Second Floor, 831-5400, Fax: 831-7979

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Superior Court Complaint

#7

(#7) DOCKET NOTE: Transcript re: proceedings in Providence County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Complaint) (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#6

(#6) RULE 16 STATEMENT by Joyce A Dermenjian. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#5

(#5) RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Maglio, David) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 1/16/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#3

(#3) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Joyce A Dermenjian. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

1 #4

Receipt

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Notice of Removal

1 #1

State Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, case number KC-2018-1159. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021579), filed by Joyce A Dermenjian. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DOCKET NOTE: Transcript re: proceedings in Providence County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Complaint) (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • TEXT ORDER: The Defendant's oral motion to amend her answer is granted. The Defendant is authorized to email documents requested by the Court to his case manager - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • TEXT ORDER: All Fact Discovery shall be completed on or before 4/16/19. Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 5/1/19. - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 1/16/2019; David E. Maglio and Joyce A. Dermenjian participated (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 16 STATEMENT by Joyce A Dermenjian. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Maglio, David) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 1/16/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 17-340-JJM, this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Joyce A Dermenjian. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, case number KC-2018-1159. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021579), filed by Joyce A Dermenjian. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 17-cv-340 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Joyce A Dermenjian. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Superior Court, case number KC-2018-1159. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021579), filed by Joyce A Dermenjian. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 17-cv-340 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less