This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:22 (UTC).

Jenkins v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Jenkins filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Thomas G. Wilson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02127

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Craig Jenkins, Jr.

Yazoo City, MS 39194

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Lynn Riedel

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM

Suite 3200, 400 N Tampa St

Tampa, FL 33602-4798

James C. Preston, Jr.

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM

Suite 3200, 400 N Tampa St

Tampa, FL 33602-4798

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:12-cr-84-T-33TGW filed by James Craig Jenkins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AG) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Jenkins' Motion to vacate/set aside/correct sentence (2255). The Clerk is directed to close this case. COA and IFP on appeal denied.. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/28/2018. (SM) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Jenkins' Motion to vacate/set aside/correct sentence (2255). The Clerk is directed to close this case. COA and IFP on appeal denied.. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/28/2018. (SM) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:12-cr-84-T-33TGW filed by James Craig Jenkins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AG) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.