This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2015 at 01:03:57 (UTC).

JENKINS et al v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 JENKINS filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Claudia Wilken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-02758

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claudia Wilken

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nigel Hayes

Martin Jenkins

Johnathan Moore

Kevin Perry

Anfornee Stewart

William Tyndall

Alec James

Defendants

Atlantic Coast Conference

BIG TEN CONFERENCE

Big 12 Conference

National Collegiate Athletic Association

Pac-12 Conference

Southeastern Conference

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Kessler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Melissa Steedle Bogad

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, Suite 730

Newak, NJ 07102-0301

David G. Feher

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue, New York

New York, NY 10019

Rebecca Formanek Furman

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California Street, Floor 35

San Francisco, CA 94111

David L. Greenspan

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Joseph A. Litman

Attorney at Winston and Strawn

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Sean D. Meenan

Attorney at Winston and Strawn

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Timothy M, Nevius

Attorney at Winston and Strawn

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Ian L Papendick

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

James S. Richter

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, Suite 730

Newark, NJ 07102

Derek J Sarafa

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Sean Gerald Wieber

Attorney at Winston and Strawn

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-9703

Defendant Attorneys

Sean C. Sheely

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

31 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10016

Duvol M. Thompson

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

31 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Michael Martinez

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1675 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Richard J. Favretto

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Britt Marie Miller

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Andrew S. Rosenman

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 South Wacker Dr.

Chicago, IL 60606

Matthew P. O'Malley

Attorney at Tompkins McGuire Wachenfeld & Barry LLP

100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102-4070

ANTHONY JOSEPH DREYER

Attorney at SKADDEN ARPS

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

105 #20

Exhibit 10

105 #18

Exhibit 8

105 #14

Exhibit 4

105 #21

Proposed Order

105 #16

Exhibit 6

105 #17

Exhibit 7

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION served on 3/19/2014, answer due 4/9/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

#105

Set/Reset Hearing re # 124 Order on Stipulation and # 105 Joint MOTION to Certify Class Consolidated Plaintiffs' and Jenkins Plaintiffs' , # 117 AMENDED JOINT MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Responses due by 4/30/2015. Replies due by 5/28/2015. Motion Hearing reset for 6/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE served on 3/19/2014, answer due 4/9/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

105 #13

Exhibit 3

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. BIG TEN CONFERENCE served on 3/19/2014, answer due 4/9/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. PAC-12 CONFERENCE served on 3/18/2014, answer due 4/8/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE, BIG 12 CONFERENCE, BIG TEN CONFERENCE, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, PAC-12 CONFERENCE, SOUTHEASTERN CONFERENCE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Marlene Kalbach* (mak) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA STEEDLE BOGAD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/18/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. BIG 12 CONFERENCE served on 3/19/2014, answer due 4/9/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

105 #19

Exhibit 9

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE, BIG 12 CONFERENCE, BIG TEN CONFERENCE, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, PAC-12 CONFERENCE, SOUTHEASTERN CONFERENCE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5565107) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mak) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

201 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Hearing re # 124 Order on Stipulation and # 105 Joint MOTION to Certify Class Consolidated Plaintiffs' and Jenkins Plaintiffs' , # 117 AMENDED JOINT MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Responses due by 4/30/2015. Replies due by 5/28/2015. Motion Hearing reset for 6/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#124) ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting # 123 in Case no. 14-cv-2758-CW and (209) in Case No. 14-md-2541-CW Stipulation Resetting Schedule for Injunctive Relief Class Certification. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/25/2015 (mklS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#123) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Resetting Schedule for Injunctive Relief Class Certification filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Martin Jenkins, et al (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 3/23/2015) Modified on 3/23/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) STIPULATED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. (Re: dkt no. # 121 in case no. 14-cv-2758-CW and dkt no. 207 in case no. 14-md-2541-CW). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/6/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015) Modified on 3/9/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) Proposed Stipulated Order Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Shawne Alston, Nicholas Kindler., Pac-12 Conference, et al (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2015) Modified on 3/5/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#120) ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. byBIG TEN CONFERENCE. (Rosenman, Andrew) (Filed on 3/2/2015) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#119) ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant NCAA's Answer to Jenkins Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint - Class Action Seeking Injunction byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Mishkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2015) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#118) ANSWER to Amended Complaint -- Answer to Second Amended Complaint bySoutheastern Conference. (Seifert, Mark) (Filed on 3/2/2015) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#117) AMENDED JOINT MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Nigel Hayes, Alec James, Martin Jenkins. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 3/30/2015. Replies due by 4/27/2015. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/20/2015) Modified on 2/23/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2015 02:00 PM. (nap, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015) (Entered: 02/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN HARRY MARINO on behalf of SOUTHEASTERN CONFERENCE (MARINO, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. SOUTHEASTERN CONFERENCE served on 3/19/2014, answer due 4/9/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. PAC-12 CONFERENCE served on 3/18/2014, answer due 4/8/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. BIG TEN CONFERENCE served on 3/19/2014, answer due 4/9/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. BIG 12 CONFERENCE served on 3/19/2014, answer due 4/9/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE served on 3/19/2014, answer due 4/9/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION served on 3/19/2014, answer due 4/9/2014. (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA STEEDLE BOGAD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BOGAD, MELISSA) (Entered: 03/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE, BIG 12 CONFERENCE, BIG TEN CONFERENCE, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, PAC-12 CONFERENCE, SOUTHEASTERN CONFERENCE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Marlene Kalbach* (mak) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE, BIG 12 CONFERENCE, BIG TEN CONFERENCE, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, PAC-12 CONFERENCE, SOUTHEASTERN CONFERENCE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5565107) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOHNATHAN MOORE, WILLIAM TYNDALL, MARTIN JENKINS, KEVIN PERRY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mak) (Entered: 03/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.