This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2018 at 07:00:47 (UTC).

Jeffrey R. Werner et al v. Landon Dowlatsingh et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2018 Jeffrey R Werner filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Landon Dowlatsingh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick F. Mumm and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03560

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Incredible Features Inc.

Jeffrey R. Werner

Defendants

Does 1-50, inclusive

Landon Dowlatsingh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan E Carreon

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Mathew K Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER RE: STIPULATION EXTENDS TIME FOR DEFENDANT LANDON DOWLATSINGH TORESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO JULY 19, 2018 #13 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Landon Dowlatsingh answer now due 7/19/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey R. Werner; Incredible Features Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

#11

(#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Landon Dowlatsingh answer now due 6/20/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner; Incredible Features Inc..(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc., upon Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh served on 4/29/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Landon Dowlatsingh in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan E Carreon counsel for Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Jeffrey R. Werner and Incredible Features Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Werner and Incredible Features Inc.. (Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Jeffrey R. Werner(pty:pla))(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner, identifying Incredible Features, Inc.. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21659078 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc.. (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Jeffrey R. Werner(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER RE: STIPULATION EXTENDS TIME FOR DEFENDANT LANDON DOWLATSINGH TORESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO JULY 19, 2018 #13 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Landon Dowlatsingh answer now due 7/19/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey R. Werner; Incredible Features Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Landon Dowlatsingh answer now due 6/20/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner; Incredible Features Inc..(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc., upon Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh served on 4/29/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Landon Dowlatsingh in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Landon Dowlatsingh. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan E Carreon counsel for Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Jeffrey R. Werner and Incredible Features Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Werner and Incredible Features Inc.. (Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Jeffrey R. Werner(pty:pla))(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner, identifying Incredible Features, Inc.. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Incredible Features Inc., Jeffrey R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21659078 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc.. (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Jeffrey R. Werner(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Incredible Feature Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan E Carreon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew K Higbee