This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:34:17 (UTC).

Jefferson et al v. U.S. Bank

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Jefferson filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against U S Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02947

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vincent Jefferson

Humble, TX 77338

Dezra Jefferson

Humble, TX 77338

Defendant

U.S. Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Barry Arthur McCain

Attorney at Dykema

1717 Main Street, Suite 4200

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) REPLY Defendant's Response to Motion for Relief from Judgment, filed by U.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCain, Barry) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Relief from the Judgment by Vincent Jefferson, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

7 #3

Proposed Order

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) ORDER on Eviction. US Bank may take possession of the property. The Jeffersons must not interfere with the bank's possession of the property. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#5

(#5) Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 9/20/2018. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 10/1/2018. Appearances: Barry McCain. No appearance by plaintiffs. (Court Reporter: G. Dye) (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by U.S. Bank, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(McCain, Barry) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) Order: Initial Conference set for 9/20/2018 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #14

Exhibit M

1 #13

Exhibit L

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 190th District Court, case number 2018-50849 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20739860) filed by U.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCain, Barry) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPLY Defendant's Response to Motion for Relief from Judgment, filed by U.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCain, Barry) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Relief from the Judgment by Vincent Jefferson, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER on Eviction. US Bank may take possession of the property. The Jeffersons must not interfere with the bank's possession of the property. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 9/20/2018. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 10/1/2018. Appearances: Barry McCain. No appearance by plaintiffs. (Court Reporter: G. Dye) (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by U.S. Bank, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(McCain, Barry) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order: Initial Conference set for 9/20/2018 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County 190th District Court, case number 2018-50849 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20739860) filed by U.S. Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCain, Barry) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.