This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:36:40 (UTC).

Jefferson Davis Parish Police Jury v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Jefferson Davis Parish Police Jury filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00879

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Davis Parish Police Jury

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc

McKesson Corporation

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Cardinal Health, Inc

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt PLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis, LLC

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael G. Stag

Attorney at Stag Liuzza, LLC

One Canal Place, 365 Canal St., Suite 2850

New Orleans, LA 70130

Roderick Alvendia

Attorney at Law Offices of Alvendia, Kelly & Demarest

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

Matthew Douglas Rogenes

Attorney at Stag Liuzza, LLC

365 Canal St., Ste. 2850

New Orleans, LA 70130

John Bartholomew Kelly, III

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

Anthony David Irpino

Attorney at Irpino Law Firm

2216 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Pearl A Robertson

Attorney at Irpino, Avin and Hawkins

2216 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephen M. Gele'

Attorney at Smith & Fawer, LLC

201 St Charles Ave, Suite 3702

New Orleans, LA 70170

Ashley M. Liuzza

Attorney at Stag Liuzza, LLC

365 Canal Street, Suite 2850

New Orleans, LA 70130

John F. Young, Jr

609 Metairie Road, Suite #300

Metairie, LA 70005

James McClendon Williams

Attorney at Chehardy, Sherman Williams Murrary Recile Stakelum & Hayes

One Galleria Boulevard, Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Randall A. Smith

Attorney at Smith & Fawer, LLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 3702

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jeanne K. Demarest

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Attachment

#2

#3

3 #1

Minute Entry NEF

#4

4 #1

Certified Transfer Order

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return on Electronic Transfer from Ohio Northern. (NLT) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. (LLH) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. Electronic letter sent. (Attachments: #1 Certified Transfer Order)(LLH) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. ( #1 Minute Entry NEF) (LLH). Modified on 10/19/2018 to add Minute Entry (LLH). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case. (LLH) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1840371.), filed by Jefferson Davis Parish Police Jury. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Irpino, Anthony) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant