This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2020 at 21:57:00 (UTC).

Filing Error

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 Filing Error was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-45365

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson County, Ohio

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

McKesson Corporation

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Russell Portenoy

Actavis LLC

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Perry Fine

Cephalon, Inc.

Scott Fishman

Miami-Luken, Inc.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Elliot Smith

Attorney at Law Office of Smith & Phillips

6660 North High Street

Worthington, OH 43085

David R. Grant

Attorney at Plevin & Gallucci

55 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Jerome Buckley

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 1

221 E Fourth Street, Suite 2000

Cincinnati, OH 45201-0236

Vincent I. Holzhall

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Alana V. Tanoury

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Eric H. Zagrans

Attorney at Zagrans Law Firm

5077 Waterford Drive

Elyria, OH 44035

Andrea B. Daloia

Attorney at Thompson Hine - Cleveland

3900 Key Tower, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

James B. Hadden

Attorney at Murray, Murphy, Moul & Basil

1114 Dublin Road

Columbus, OH 43215

Brian K. Murphy

Attorney at Murray, Murphy, Moul & Basil

1114 Dublin Road

Columbus, OH 43215

Tera N. Coleman

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

219 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

O. Judson Scheaf, III

Attorney at Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Columbus

65 East State Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Jordan D. Rauch

Attorney at Dickinson Wright - Columbus

24Th Floor, 150 East Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Gregory D. Brunton

Attorney at Gordon & Rees - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Bruce A. Moore

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Daniel J. Hyzak

Attorney at Gordon & Rees - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Tyler G. Tarney

Attorney at Gordon & Rees - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Clay K. Keller

Attorney at Jackson Kelly - Akron

50 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

Other Attorneys

Erin E. Rhinehart

Attorney at Faruki Ireland Cox Rhinehart & Dusing - Dayton

110 North Main Street

Dayton, OH 45402

Christopher C. Hollon

Attorney at Faruki Ireland Cox Rhinehart & Dusing - Dayton

110 North Main Street

Dayton, OH 45402

Donald Jeffrey Ireland

Attorney at Faruki Ireland Cox Rhinehart & Dusing - Dayton

110 North Main Street

Dayton, OH 45402

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

33 #1

*Restricted*

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

27 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#27

#6

#5

#4

3 #4

part five

3 #3

part four

3 #2

part three

3 #1

part two

#3

#2

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCASE OPENING ERROR. This case will be terminated. See 1:18op45365 DAP(MDL 2804) (P,R) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00037. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (sct) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Certified Transfer Order from United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio re MDL 2804. (sct) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE by Defendant Russell Portenoy JOINT NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (Rauch, Jordan) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion. Miami-Luken shall have until sixty (60) days after removal is finally determined in order to answer, move or otherwise repsond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/23/2018. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Thomas Hurney, Frank Gallucci, and Paul J. Napoli. (kpt) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE by Plaintiff Jefferson County, Ohio NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF RUSSELL PORTENOY, M.D. (Rauch, Jordan) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Unopposed MOTION re #1 Notice of Removal,, to Stay the Date by Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for an Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal by Defendant Miami-Luken, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Keller, Clay) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Clay Kenneth Keller for Defendant Miami-Luken, Inc. (Keller, Clay) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION to Stay The Date by Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and for An Extension of Time Pending Final Determination of Removal by Defendant Russell Portenoy. (Scheaf, O) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Valle Tanoury for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Tanoury, Alana) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Hyzak for Defendants Perry Fine, Scott Fishman (Hyzak, Daniel) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Tarney for Defendants Perry Fine, Scott Fishman (Tarney, Tyler) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory D Brunton for Defendants Perry Fine, Scott Fishman (Brunton, Gregory) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Jefferson County, Ohio (State Court Complaint filed in the Court of Common Pleas, Jefferson County, Ohio on 12/13/17). (Attachments: #1 part two, #2 part three, #3 part four) (sem) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2018: #4 part five) (kpt). [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo International plc, Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Court of Common Pleas, case number 17 CV 00554 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6275828), filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - Service Papers, #4 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit 3 - MDL Transfer Order, #6 Exhibit 4 - Joseph v. Baxter, #7 Exhibit 5 - Cty. Comm. of McDowell, #8 Exhibit 6 - City of Huntington v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp.) (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 4/6/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miami-Luken, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Actavis Pharma, Inc. is a litigant