This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2018 at 02:44:21 (UTC).

Jane Doe v. Rhode Island School of Design

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 Jane Doe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Rhode Island School of Design. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendant

Rhode Island School of Design

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David C. Williams

Nadeem A. Bezar

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua W.B. Richards

Steven M. Richard

 

Court Documents

13 #1

*Restricted*

#13

#12

11 #3

Exhibit B

11 #2

Exhibit A

11 #1

Certificate of Service

#11

#10

9 #2

Certificate of Service

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A

#9

8 #3

Text of Proposed Order

8 #2

Declaration

8 #1

Memorandum

#8

#7

#6

#5

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-01659. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER-MEMORANDUM: ORDERED THAT THIS MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF RHODE ISLAND. DEFENDANT'S MOTION (DOC. #8 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS MATTER FOR STATISTICAL AND ALL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/6/2017. 12/8/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(WILLIAMS, DAVID) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 7/18/2017 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. #8 ). SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/19/2017.6/20/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by JANE DOE.Plaintiff's Unoppposed Motion to Extend Time. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(WILLIAMS, DAVID) (Entered: 06/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN.Defendant Rhode Island School of Design's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue includes Memorandum, Declaration of Samuel Solomon and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHARDS, JOSHUA) (Entered: 06/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT ATTORNEY STEVEN M. RICHARD'S APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/25/2017. 4/26/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APP MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 04/26/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven M. Richard by RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12022771.). (RICHARDS, JOSHUA) (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA W.B. RICHARDS on behalf of RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN with Certificate of Service(RICHARDS, JOSHUA) (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by NADEEM A. BEZAR on behalf of JANE DOE (BEZAR, NADEEM) (Entered: 04/20/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANE DOE. RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN waiver sent on 4/14/2017, answer due 6/13/2017. (BEZAR, NADEEM) (Entered: 04/14/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID C. WILLIAMS on behalf of JANE DOE (WILLIAMS, DAVID) (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by JANE DOE. (jmv, ) (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued as to RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN. Forwarded To: 1 Orig mailed to counsel on 4/12/17 (jmv, ) (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against RHODE ISLAND SCHOOL OF DESIGN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE157982), filed by JANE DOE.(jmv, ) (Entered: 04/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less