This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2018 at 08:02:46 (UTC).

James v. Wade et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 James filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Wade. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orinda D. Evans. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04205

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orinda D. Evans

 

Party Details

Appellant and Debtor

Monique Rochelle James

Conyers, GA 30094

Appellees

American Homes 4 RentProperties Eight LLC

William J. Layng, Jr.

Atlanta, GA 30339

Brandi N. Wade, Esq.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

William J. Layng, Jr.

Attorney at William J. Layng, P.C.

2451 Cumberland Parkway, Suite 3477

Atlanta, GA 30339

Brandi Nicole Wade

Attorney at O'Kelley & Sorohan, Attorneys at Law, LLC

Suite 375, 2170 Satellite Boulevard

Duluth, GA 30097

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 11/9/2018. (sap) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

4 #1

Doc45-Amended Appeal

#4

(#4) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc45-Amended Appeal)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

3 #15

Doc20

3 #14

Doc19

3 #13

Doc18

3 #12

Doc16

3 #11

Doc15

3 #10

Doc14

3 #9

Doc13

3 #8

Doc9

3 #7

Doc8

3 #6

Doc7

3 #5

Doc6

3 #4

Doc5

3 #3

Doc4

3 #2

Doc3

3 #1

Doc1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Monique Rochelle James re #5 Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule. (sap) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 11/9/2018. (sap) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc45-Amended Appeal)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc1, #2 Doc3, #3 Doc4, #4 Doc5, #5 Doc6, #6 Doc7, #7 Doc8, #8 Doc9, #9 Doc13, #10 Doc14, #11 Doc15, #12 Doc16, #13 Doc18, #14 Doc19, #15 Doc20, #16 Doc24, #17 Doc25, #18 Doc26, #19 Doc27, #20 Doc38, #21 Doc39, #22 Doc40, #23 Doc42, #24 Docket Report)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Monique Rochelle James re #2 Order ruling on IFP. (sap) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER GRANTING the Appellant's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/27/2018. (sap) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Remark: The Clerk's Office has Received #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal in Paper. (sap) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for Review; and for Fee Determination, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 18-59511-BEM filed by Monique Rochelle James. Notice of Appeal filed 9/4/18 from Order entered 8/30/18 by Appellant Monique Rochelle James. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 33 - NOA, #2 Doc. 31 - Order, #3 Doc. 34 - IFP, #4 Docket Report)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.