This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2019 at 07:28:50 (UTC).

JAK Application LLC v. AGCO Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 JAK Application LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AGCO Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAK Application LLC

Defendants

AGCO Corporation

Westco Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis A. Etoch

Attorney at Etoch Law Firm

Post Office Box 100

Helena-West Helena, AR 72342-0100

John Martell Landis

Attorney at Etoch Law Firm

221 West Second Street, Suite 312

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

Jake Carroll

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Parkway, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

Jill Johnson

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Parkway, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

M. Stephen Bingham

Attorney at Cross, Gunter, Witherspoon & Galchus, P.C.

Post Office Box 3178

Little Rock, AR 72203-3178

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet (submitted 12/11/2018)

#1

(#8) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was received from the filing party and added as an attachment to docket entry #1 . (Copy attached hereto for review by the parties.) (thd) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AGCO Corporation filed by JAK Application LLC. (ljb) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#4

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Brief in Support, #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JAK Application LLC (Etoch, Louis) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by AGCO Corporation (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jake Carroll. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3363672. Filed by AGCO Corporation (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jill Johnson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3363673. Filed by AGCO Corporation (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was received from the filing party and added as an attachment to docket entry #1 . (Copy attached hereto for review by the parties.) (thd) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#9

(#10) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/13/2018. (sjh) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#19

(#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AGCO Corporation (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#20

(#20) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AGCO Corporation. (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#18

(#18) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AGCO Corporation, Westco Insurance Company filed by JAK Application LLC. Summons issued for Westco Insurance Company and returned to counsel for service. (fjg) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to File by JAK Application LLC (Landis, John) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#16

(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AGCO Corporation. (Carroll, Jake) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#3

(#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JAK Application LLC. (Landis, John) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit

#14

(#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JAK Application LLC. (Landis, John) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#15

(#15) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Response to Motion filed by JAK Application LLC. (Landis, John) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AGCO Corporation. (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AGCO Corporation (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Summons Reissued as to Westco Insurance Company and returned to counsel for service. (fjg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AGCO Corporation, Westco Insurance Company filed by JAK Application LLC. Summons issued for Westco Insurance Company and returned to counsel for service. (fjg) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File an amended complaint. Plaintiff may file its amended complaint within five days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/16/19. (amr) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AGCO Corporation. (Carroll, Jake) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Response to Motion filed by JAK Application LLC. (Landis, John) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JAK Application LLC. (Landis, John) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion for Leave to File filed by JAK Application LLC. (Landis, John) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to File by JAK Application LLC (Landis, John) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/13/2018. (sjh) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Brief in Support, #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JAK Application LLC (Etoch, Louis) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was received from the filing party and added as an attachment to docket entry #1 . (Copy attached hereto for review by the parties.) (thd) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jill Johnson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3363673. Filed by AGCO Corporation (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jake Carroll. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3363672. Filed by AGCO Corporation (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by AGCO Corporation (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AGCO Corporation. (Bingham, M.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AGCO Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bingham, M.) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AGCO Corporation filed by JAK Application LLC. (ljb) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AGCO Corporation from Phillips County Circuit Court, Case Number 54CV-18-293. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT069902. (ljb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (thd). (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.