This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2019 at 07:59:40 (UTC).

Jackson vs Chem Carriers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Jackson filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Chem Carriers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01052

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clarence Jackson

Defendants

Plaquemine Point Shipyard LLC

Chem Carriers, LLC

ABC Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David L. Bateman

Attorney at Bateman Law Firm

6010 Perkins Road, Suite A

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

John Michael McDonald

Attorney at Bateman Law Firm

6700 Jefferson Hwy., Ste Building 3

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Defendant Attorneys

Georges M. Legrand

Attorney at Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett

Suite 4250 One Shell Square, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139-4250

Trevor M. Cutaiar

Attorney at Mouledoux Brand Legrand and Brackett

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4250

New Orleans, LA 70139

Adam P. Sanderson

Attorney at Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett

Suite 4250 One Shell Square, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139-4250

 

Court Documents

9 #1

proposed order

9 #2

Proposed Pleading;

9 #3

Exhibit A

9 #4

Exhibit B

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit and Motion to Strike Record Document 7 by Chem Carriers, LLC, Plaquemine Point Shipyard LLC. (Attachments: #1 proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Legrand, Georges) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

9 #5

Exhibit C

9 #6

Exhibit D

9 #8

Exhibit F

9 #7

Exhibit E

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for January 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 2/8/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 10/30/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 12/2/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 12/16/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 1/16/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 2/18/2020. Motions shall be filed by 3/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/18/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 9/8/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 10/2/2020. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020-10/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (JSL) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

7 #4

Exhibit D

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #6

Exhibit F

7 #5

Exhibit E

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Chem Carriers, LLC, Plaquemine Point Shipyard LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Legrand, Georges) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/22/2019) (ELW). Modified on 1/22/2019 to correct page orientation (ELW). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Bateman, David) Modified on 1/2/2019 to rotate the pages (KAH). (Entered: 12/31/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits and Strike Non-Compliant Opposition. The Clerk of Court shall strike R. Doc. 7 and file R. Doc. 9-2 and attachments into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for January 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 2/8/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 10/30/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 12/2/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 12/16/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 1/16/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 2/18/2020. Motions shall be filed by 3/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/18/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 9/8/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 10/2/2020. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020-10/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (JSL) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit and Motion to Strike Record Document 7 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit and Motion to Strike Record Document 7 by Chem Carriers, LLC, Plaquemine Point Shipyard LLC. (Attachments: #1 proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Legrand, Georges) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to #7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition,. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Strike the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (ELW) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Chem Carriers, LLC, Plaquemine Point Shipyard LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Legrand, Georges) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/22/2019) (ELW). Modified on 1/22/2019 to correct page orientation (ELW). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint STATUS REPORT by Clarence Jackson. (Bateman, David) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chem Carriers, LLC, Plaquemine Point Shipyard LLC. (Legrand, Georges) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Bateman, David) Modified on 1/2/2019 to rotate the pages (KAH). (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Chem Carriers, LLC, Plaquemine Point Shipyard LLC.(Legrand, Georges) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial Court for Ibervile Parish, Case Number 78,406. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1868955), filed by Chem Carriers, LLC, Plaquemine Point Shipyard LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 A-State Ct record, #3 B-Sworn Declaration, #4 C-Accident report, #5 D-Photo of shipyard)(Legrand, Georges) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.