This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2019 at 07:41:03 (UTC).

Jackson v. West et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Jackson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against West. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Deere and Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00312

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Beth Deere

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clayton Mathew Jackson

Dewitt, AR 72042

Defendants

Hunter West

Todd Wright

Sean Hargrove

Patricia Snyder

K Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline V. Hays

Attorney at C. Burt Newell, Attorney at Law

Post Office Box 1620

Hot Springs, AR 71902-1620

C. Burt Newell

Attorney at C. Burt Newell, Attorney at Law

Post Office Box 1620

Hot Springs, AR 71902-1620

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Filing Calculation Sheet and Certificate of Prisoner Account by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (llg) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#2

(#26) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint by Sean Hargrove, Patricia Snyder, Hunter West.(Hays, Caroline)(Docket text modified on 2/7/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#3

(#21) ORDER approving and adopting #15 Recommendation in all respects; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Jackson's failure-to-protect, access-to-the-courts, and First Amendment claims; dismissing, without prejudice, Defendant Wright and Williams from this lawsuit; and denying #3 Mr. Jackson's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Mr. Jackson is allowed to proceed with his excessive-force claims against Defendant Hargrove and his retaliation claims against Defendants Hargrove, West, and Snyder. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/16/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of the Court to enclose an application to proceed IFP along with a copy of this order; and directing the Plaintiff to return a completed IFP or pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/17/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#5

(#7) ORDER granting #5 plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account until the $350 filing fee is paid; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Detention Center; and directing Mr. Jackson to file a second amended complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/21/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#6

(#26) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint by Sean Hargrove, Patricia Snyder, Hunter West.(Hays, Caroline)(Docket text modified on 2/7/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#7

(#10) RESPONSE re #7 Order by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (kdr) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (llg) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#9

(#9) EXHIBITS by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (kdr) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#26

(#26) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint by Sean Hargrove, Patricia Snyder, Hunter West.(Hays, Caroline)(Docket text modified on 2/7/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by C. Burt Newell on behalf of Sean Hargrove, Patricia Snyder, Hunter West (Newell, C.) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#11

(#26) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint by Sean Hargrove, Patricia Snyder, Hunter West.(Hays, Caroline)(Docket text modified on 2/7/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#24

(#24) ORDER re #23 Mail Returned, #22 Mail Returned. Mr. Jackson is directed to notify the Court of his new address within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/25/2019. (csf) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#25

(#25) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Clayton Mathew Jackson re #24 Order. (fjg) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#23

(#23) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Clayton Mathew Jackson re #15 Partial Recommended Disposition, Copy of Docket Sheet, #20 Order, #21 Order. (fjg) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#22

(#22) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Clayton Mathew Jackson re #16 Objection to Partial Recommended Disposition, #17 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #18 Motion for Copies, #19 Exhibit. (fjg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER denying, without prejudice #17 motion to appoint counsel; granting in part and denying in part #18 motion for a copy of the docket sheet and copies of all the documents filed in the case so far; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send Mr. Jackson a copy of the docket sheet and copy of #15 pending Partial Recommended Disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/15/2019. (cmn) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER approving and adopting #15 Recommendation in all respects; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Jackson's failure-to-protect, access-to-the-courts, and First Amendment claims; dismissing, without prejudice, Defendant Wright and Williams from this lawsuit; and denying #3 Mr. Jackson's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Mr. Jackson is allowed to proceed with his excessive-force claims against Defendant Hargrove and his retaliation claims against Defendants Hargrove, West, and Snyder. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/16/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #26 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Appearance by C. Burt Newell on behalf of Sean Hargrove, Patricia Snyder, Hunter West (Newell, C.) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint by Sean Hargrove, Patricia Snyder, Hunter West.(Hays, Caroline)(Docket text modified on 2/7/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Clayton Mathew Jackson re #24 Order. (fjg) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER re #23 Mail Returned, #22 Mail Returned. Mr. Jackson is directed to notify the Court of his new address within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/25/2019. (csf) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Clayton Mathew Jackson re #15 Partial Recommended Disposition, Copy of Docket Sheet, #20 Order, #21 Order. (fjg) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Clayton Mathew Jackson re #16 Objection to Partial Recommended Disposition, #17 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #18 Motion for Copies, #19 Exhibit. (fjg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER approving and adopting #15 Recommendation in all respects; dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Jackson's failure-to-protect, access-to-the-courts, and First Amendment claims; dismissing, without prejudice, Defendant Wright and Williams from this lawsuit; and denying #3 Mr. Jackson's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Mr. Jackson is allowed to proceed with his excessive-force claims against Defendant Hargrove and his retaliation claims against Defendants Hargrove, West, and Snyder. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/16/2019. (ljb) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER denying, without prejudice #17 motion to appoint counsel; granting in part and denying in part #18 motion for a copy of the docket sheet and copies of all the documents filed in the case so far; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send Mr. Jackson a copy of the docket sheet and copy of #15 pending Partial Recommended Disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/15/2019. (cmn) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) EXHIBIT by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (kdr) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE re #7 Order by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (kdr) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXHIBITS by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (kdr) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (llg) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account until the $350 filing fee is paid; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Detention Center; and directing Mr. Jackson to file a second amended complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/21/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (ljb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (ljb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of the Court to enclose an application to proceed IFP along with a copy of this order; and directing the Plaintiff to return a completed IFP or pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/17/2018. (cmn) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Petition for Emergency Injunction by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (kdr) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (llg) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Filing Calculation Sheet and Certificate of Prisoner Account by Clayton Mathew Jackson. (llg) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.