This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:40:38 (UTC).

Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc. v. Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2013 Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary (MDL2196). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:13-PF-10007

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary (MDL2196)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc. doing business as Cleveland Chair Company doing business as Jackson Furniture doing business as Catnapper

Defendants

FFP Holdings, LLC

E.R. Carpenter, L.P.

Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company

The Carpenter Company

Flexible Foam Products LLC

Flexible Foam Products, Inc.

Scottdel Inc

FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.

Future Foam Inc

Vitafoam Products Canada Limited

Vitafoam Inc

British Vita Unlimited

Mohawk Industries Inc.

Leggett & Platt Inc.

Carpenter Chemical, L.P.

Carpenter Holdings, Inc.

Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.

Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc.

Woodbridge Foam Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M. Paul Killian

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Leo Law

200 Randolph Avenue

Huntsville, AL 35801

William G. Colvin

Attorney at Ste. 428

801 Broad Street

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley R. Love

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Caitlin S. Schroeder

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Christopher J. Bayh

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Deborah Pollack-Milgate

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kathleen M. Anderson

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

888 South Harrison Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Kendall Millard

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Larry A. Mackey

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michael D. Mustard

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg - Fort Wayne

888 South Harrison Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Bethany G. Lukitsch

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Howard Feller

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

James H. Walsh

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Richmond

One James Center, 901 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Anitra G. Royster

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

4721 Emperor Blvd.

Durham, NC 27703

Frank A. Hirsch, Jr.

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

555 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Heather B. Adams

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Alston & Bird - Durham

4721 Emperor Blvd.

Durham, NC 27703

Matthew P. McGuire

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

555 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Matthew D. Montaigne

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

555 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Michael R. Hoernlein

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Charlotte

101 South Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28280

Richard A. McAvoy

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Durham

555 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

43 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Order of case closing per the attached Order of termination of multidistrict litigation filed in the master docket, MDL 2196, 1:10md2196, document no. 2114. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/2/2016. (R,Sh) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

#22

(#22) Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against The Carpenter Company, E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Carpenter Holdings, Inc. Related document #21 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 1/7/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc.. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 09/27/2013)

#19

(#19) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 09/27/2013)

#18

(#18) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by Woodbridge Foam Corporation. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 09/27/2013)

#17

(#17) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by E.R. Carpenter, L.P.. (Lukitsch, Bethany) (Entered: 09/03/2013)

#4

(#14) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 09/03/2013)

1 #20

Summons Summons to Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.

1 #18

Summons Summons to Woodbridge Foam Corporation

1 #17

Summons Summons to Vitafoam Products Canada, Ltd.

1 #16

Summons Summons to Vitafoam Inc.

1 #10

Summons Summons to Leggett & Platt, Inc.

1 #8

Summons Summons to Future Foam, Inc.

1 #6

Summons Summons to Flexible Foam Products, Inc.

1 #3

Summons Summons to Carpenter Holdings, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Order of case closing per the attached Order of termination of multidistrict litigation filed in the master docket, MDL 2196, 1:10md2196, document no. 2114. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/2/2016. (R,Sh) (Entered: 11/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff's claims against The Carpenter Company, E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Carpenter Holdings, Inc. Related document #21 . Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 1/7/2015. (K,K) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Carpenter Holdings, Inc., E.R. Carpenter, L.P., The Carpenter Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lukitsch, Bethany) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc.. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 09/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 09/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by Woodbridge Foam Corporation. (Kop, Allison) (Entered: 09/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by E.R. Carpenter, L.P.. (Lukitsch, Bethany) (Entered: 09/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by Carpenter Holdings, Inc.. (Lukitsch, Bethany) (Entered: 09/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by The Carpenter Company. (Lukitsch, Bethany) (Entered: 09/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 09/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Answer to #4 Amended complaint filed by Future Foam Inc. (Blinn, Meghan) (Entered: 09/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Eastern. Case number 1:13-cv-00198. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketCase transferred to Northern District of Ohio. (CNM, ) [Transferred from tned on 7/19/2013.] (Entered: 07/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER; Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 1, 2010, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Jack Zouhary. (CNM, ) [Transferred from tned on 7/19/2013.] (Entered: 07/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Colvin, William) [Transferred from tned on 7/19/2013.] (Entered: 06/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc..(Colvin, William) [Transferred from tned on 7/19/2013.] (Entered: 06/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(CNM, ) [Transferred from tned on 7/19/2013.] (Entered: 06/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Colvin, William) [Transferred from tned on 7/19/2013.] (Entered: 06/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketDistrict Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CNM, ) [Transferred from tned on 7/19/2013.] (Entered: 06/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-2275068.), filed by JACKSON FURNITURE INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to British Vita Unlimited, #3 Summons Summons to Carpenter Holdings, Inc., #4 Summons Summons to Domfoam International, Inc., #5 Summons Summons to E.R. Carpenter, L.P., #6 Summons Summons to Flexible Foam Products, Inc., #7 Summons Summons to Foamex Innovations, Inc., #8 Summons Summons to Future Foam, Inc., #9 Summons Summons to Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, #10 Summons Summons to Leggett & Platt, Inc., #11 Summons Summons to Mohawk Industries, Inc., #12 Summons Summons to Ohio Decorative Products, Inc., #13 Summons Summons to Scottdel, Inc., #14 Summons Summons to The Carpenter Company, #15 Summons Summons to Valle Foam Industries, Inc., #16 Summons Summons to Vitafoam Inc., #17 Summons Summons to Vitafoam Products Canada, Ltd., #18 Summons Summons to Woodbridge Foam Corporation, #19 Summons Summons to Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., #20 Summons Summons to Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.)(Colvin, William) [Transferred from tned on 7/19/2013.] (Entered: 06/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenter Holdings, Inc. is a litigant