This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:44:51 (UTC).

Jackson et al v. White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 Jackson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Ronnie Greer and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00319

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kyle Jackson

Don Marie Jackson

Defendants

White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC

Development Services Group, Inc.

Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide,Inc.

Maximum Hospitality

Maximum Hospitality doing business as MH Partners, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin A Gastel

Attorney at Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC

223 Rosa L. Parks Avenue, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37203

J. Gerard Stranch, IV

Attorney at Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC

223 Rosa L. Parks Avenue, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant Attorney

J Chad Hogue

Attorney at Law Office of Julie Bhattacharya Peak

5409 Maryland Way, Suite 212

Brentwood, TN 37027

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's (s') counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 09/20/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

13 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge

#13

(#13) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J. Ronnie Greer on 9/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (ADA) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Maximum Hospitality, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide,Inc..(Hogue, J) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC.(Hogue, J) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION and Agreement to Substitute Party Defendant by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. (Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC served on 8/16/2018. (Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. Development Services Group, Inc. served on 8/8/2018. (Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide,Inc. served on 8/13/2018. (Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION OF EXTENSION by White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC. (Hogue, J) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/06/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/06/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/06/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

1 #4

Summons Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC

1 #3

Summons White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC

1 #2

Summons Development Service Group, Inc.

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Development Services Group, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide,Inc., White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3735415.), filed by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Development Service Group, Inc., #3 Summons White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC, #4 Summons Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC)(Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's (s') counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 09/20/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J. Ronnie Greer on 9/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (ADA) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Maximum Hospitality, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide,Inc..(Hogue, J) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC.(Hogue, J) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION and Agreement to Substitute Party Defendant by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. (Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC served on 8/16/2018. (Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. Development Services Group, Inc. served on 8/8/2018. (Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide,Inc. served on 8/13/2018. (Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION OF EXTENSION by White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC. (Hogue, J) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/06/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/06/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/06/2018. (CAT) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Development Services Group, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide,Inc., White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC, #2 Summons Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC) (CAT) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Development Services Group, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide,Inc., White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3735415.), filed by Don Marie Jackson, Kyle Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Development Service Group, Inc., #3 Summons White Avenue Hotel Partners, LLC, #4 Summons Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC)(Gastel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less