This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2018 at 10:45:26 (UTC).

Jack v. Grose

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 Jack filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Grose. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Algenon L. Marbley and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-00633

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Algenon L. Marbley

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Jack

Tri-State Disposal, LLC

Defendants

Dean Grose

South Park Ventures, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clay Kenneth Keller(Designation Retained)

Gary A Corroto(Designation Retained)

David L Dingwell(Designation Retained)

Maria C Klutinoty Edwards

Defendant Attorneys

J Michael Baggett(Designation Retained)

Mark A Ropchock

 

Court Documents

#71

(#71) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/4/2018. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ, 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ (ew)

#68

(#68) ORDER granting in part 62 Motion to Compel: Documents responsive to Plaintiff's subpoena to the Interested Parties must be produced with an "Attorney's Eyes Only" designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/13/2017. (ew)

#25

(#25) OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count One is DISMISSED as to Dean Grose only; Count Two is DISMISSED as to Dean Grose only; and Count Three is DISMISSED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/13/2017. (cw)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/4/2018. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00633-ALM-KAJ, 2:17-cv-00808-ALM-KAJ (ew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) ORDER granting in part 62 Motion to Compel: Documents responsive to Plaintiff's subpoena to the Interested Parties must be produced with an "Attorney's Eyes Only" designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/13/2017. (ew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count One is DISMISSED as to Dean Grose only; Count Two is DISMISSED as to Dean Grose only; and Count Three is DISMISSED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/13/2017. (cw)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L. Dingwell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary A Corroto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clay K. Keller