This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2018 at 05:54:05 (UTC).

Islam v. Gartland et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 Islam filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Gartland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Ott and R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E Ott

Presiding Judge

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Noor Islam

Gadsden, AL 35901

Respondents

Warden Patrick Gartland

Jeff Sessions

John Kelly

C Smith

Sean W. Gallagher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Jason W Blanchard

Attorney at ANDERSON TATE & CARR PC

1505 Lakes Parkway, Suite 100

Lawrenceville, GA 30043

 

Court Documents

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 5:17-cv-00108. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/18/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER that this action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, Middle Division for further consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/18/2018. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 01/18/2018)

13 #1

envelope

#13

(#13) REQUEST for documents by Noor Islam. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Noor Islam. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)

12 #1

envelope

#11

(#11) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Patrick Gartland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Taylor w exhibits)(Blanchard, Jason) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/05/2017)

11 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Michael Taylor w exhibits

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Noor Islam. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/29/2017)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting Respondent's #4 Motion for Extension of Time; the deadline for Respondent to file a Return shall be extended by twenty-one (21) days, up to and including October 5, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/15/2017. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)

#9

(#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not at this facility. #5 Order dated 9/15/2017. Mail sent to Noor Islam. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/27/2017)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Noor Islam. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/20/2017)

#7

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

Receipt

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 5:17-cv-00108. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER that this action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, Middle Division for further consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/18/2018. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REQUEST for documents by Noor Islam. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Change of Address by Noor Islam. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Patrick Gartland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Taylor w exhibits)(Blanchard, Jason) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Noor Islam. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not at this facility. #5 Order dated 9/15/2017. Mail sent to Noor Islam. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Noor Islam. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entered in error. Duplicate of number 6. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) U.S. Marshal Return as to the Attorney General of the United States for #2 Order and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Noor Islam, served on 8/30/2017. Green card signed by E. Sase on 8/30/17. (csr) Modified on 9/15/2017 (csr). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Patrick Gartland Return due 10/5/2017. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting Respondent's #4 Motion for Extension of Time; the deadline for Respondent to file a Return shall be extended by twenty-one (21) days, up to and including October 5, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/15/2017. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Return on Order to Show Cause. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Return on Order to Show Cause, filed by Patrick Gartland. Responses due by 9/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blanchard, Jason) Modified on 9/7/2017 (csr). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Patrick Gartland answer due 9/14/2017. (slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) U.S. Marshal Return as to U.S. Attorney's Office SDGA for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #2 Order, on 8/25/17. Green card returned signed by Rosa Oates on 8/25/17. (slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER directing service by USMS of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Noor Islam. Respondent is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing, within twenty (20) days of the date of service. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to amend Respondent's name upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms). (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Noor Islam. $5.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: BWK007337. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Supplement, #3 Receipt, #4 Envelope)(csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.