This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2018 at 07:55:47 (UTC).

ISAAC v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 ISAAC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAY D LAND and STEPHEN HYLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00198

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

Referral Judge

STEPHEN HYLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XAVIER ISAAC

Columbus, GA 31903

Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST

JOHN DANIEL

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

SHAPIRO PENDERGAST & HASTY LLP

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CHANDLER THOMPSON

170 S Main St Ste 950

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION and Memorandum in Support of MOTION for More Definite Statement by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC filed by CHANDLER THOMPSON. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(THOMPSON, CHANDLER) Modified on 10/17/2018 (tlp). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by XAVIER ISAAC. Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES(tlf). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER to Recast Complaint:(); granting #6 Motion for More Definite Statement. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-17-18. (jdl) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#11

(#11) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for Defendants (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Recast Complaint, filed by XAVIER ISAAC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documentatoin to Complaint: Mortgage, Bank, and SSA docs, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

9 #1

Revised USM-285

#16

(#16) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC and SHAPIRO PENDERGAST & HASTY LLP. (esl) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

12 #2

Envelope

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (long form) amending #2 Motion, filed by XAVIER ISAAC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documentation, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#15

(#15) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for JOHN DANIEL (tlp) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to USA Defendants, inlcuding Civil Process Clerk and U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tlp) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#17

(#17) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return UNEXECUTED for DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (tlp) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#13

(#13) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for CIVIL PROCESS CLERK - DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (tlp) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

4 #1

Supporting documentation

12 #1

Supporting documentatoin to Complaint: Mortgage, Bank, and SSA docs

4 #2

Envelope

#9

(#9) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for DEFENDANTS including Civil Process Clerk and U.S. Attorney(tlp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 Revised USM-285) (tlp). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return UNEXECUTED for DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (tlp) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC and SHAPIRO PENDERGAST & HASTY LLP. (esl) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for JOHN DANIEL (tlp) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have an additional thirty (30) days to file a recast complaint. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-1-18 (jdl) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for CIVIL PROCESS CLERK - DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (tlp) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Recast Complaint, filed by XAVIER ISAAC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documentatoin to Complaint: Mortgage, Bank, and SSA docs, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for Defendants (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to USA Defendants, inlcuding Civil Process Clerk and U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tlp) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for DEFENDANTS including Civil Process Clerk and U.S. Attorney(tlp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #1 Revised USM-285) (tlp). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER to Recast Complaint:(); granting #6 Motion for More Definite Statement. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-17-18. (jdl) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION and Memorandum in Support of MOTION for More Definite Statement by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC filed by CHANDLER THOMPSON. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(THOMPSON, CHANDLER) Modified on 10/17/2018 (tlp). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-16-18. (jdl) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (long form) amending #2 Motion, filed by XAVIER ISAAC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documentation, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tlp) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#3) This is a text only entry; no document issued.ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit completed long-form IFP motion within fourteen (14) days and directing the Clerk to provide Plaintiff with standard IFP long-form for completion. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-1-18. (jdl) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by XAVIER ISAAC. Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES(tlf). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by XAVIER ISAAC against CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC, JOHN DANIEL, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, SHAPIRO PENDERGAST & HASTY LLP, and VENDEE MORTGAGE TRUST (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mortgage Documents, #3 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES added for the purpose of ruling on motion on IFP (tlf). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.