This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2018 at 07:25:39 (UTC).

ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC. v. BASF CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against BASF CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donetta W. Ambrose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01456

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donetta W. Ambrose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.

Defendants

WANHUA CHEMICAL (AMERICA), LTD.

BASF SE

BASF CORPORATION

COVESTRO AG

HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC

THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

COVESTRO LLC

WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason A. Zweig

Melvin B. Hollowell

E. Powell Miller

Steve W. Berman

Sharon S. Almonrode

Anthony Shapiro

Ronnie Spiegel

Defendant Attorney

Andrew S. Marovitz

 

Court Documents

22 #1

*Restricted*

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

1 #9

Exhibit 8-CPI Members

1 #8

Exhibit 7-About the Diisocyanate Panel

1 #7

Exhibit 6-Antitrust Division Manual

1 #6

Exhibit 5-Herfindahl-Hirschman Index

1 #5

Exhibit 4-Henry Hub

1 #4

Exhibit 3-Diisocyanate Explained

1 #3

Exhibit 2-Diisocyanate Explained

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2018
  • Docket(#23) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned must disqualify herself in this proceeding. Lisa Pupo Lenihan, United States Magistrate Judge, therefore, recuses herself from all proceedings in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/23/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-12089. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCase transferred to Western District of Pennsylvania. (SSch) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania for MDL 2862 (SSch) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order to Western District of Pennsylvania for MDL # 2862. (SSch) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MDL Certified Transfer Order for MDL # 2862. [Informational Copy] (SSch) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Steve W. Berman on behalf of Isaac Industries, Inc.. (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin B. Hollowell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hollowell, Melvin) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Stipulated Order Setting Time To Answer and/or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION TO EXTEND All Deadlines Until After The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Rules on Pending Motion for Transfer (Agreed) by BASF Corporation, Covestro, LLC, Huntsman International LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, Wanhua Chemical (America), Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - JPML Motion, #3 Exhibit 2 - JPML Briefing Schedule, #4 Exhibit 3 - Emma Chemicals Response (E.D. Pa.), #5 Exhibit 4 - Order granting stay (Utah Foam)) (Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Covestro, LLC served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018. (Miller, E.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronnie Seidel Spiegel on behalf of Isaac Industries, Inc.. (Spiegel, Ronnie) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Zweig on behalf of Isaac Industries, Inc.. (Zweig, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Shapiro on behalf of Isaac Industries, Inc.. (Shapiro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Steve W. Berman on behalf of Isaac Industries, Inc.. (Berman, Steve) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SOso) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III* and *Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub* to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris (ATee) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Almonrode, Sharon) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6802775 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Midland County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Wanhua Chemical to Build Plant in Louisiana, #3 Exhibit 2-Diisocyanate Explained, #4 Exhibit 3-Diisocyanate Explained, #5 Exhibit 4-Henry Hub, #6 Exhibit 5-Herfindahl-Hirschman Index, #7 Exhibit 6-Antitrust Division Manual, #8 Exhibit 7-About the Diisocyanate Panel, #9 Exhibit 8-CPI Members) (Miller, E.) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less