This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2019 at 07:57:04 (UTC).

IPENN VENTURES, L.P. v. VIRGINIA COLLEGE, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 IPENN VENTURES, L P filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VIRGINIA COLLEGE, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01517

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IPENN VENTURES, L.P.

Defendants

VIRGINIA COLLEGE, LLC

KAPLAN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan M. Kamin

Attorney at Goldberg, Kamin & Garvin

437 Grant Street, 1806 Frick Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

J. Julius Bolock

Attorney at Goldberg, Kamin & Garvin LLP

1806 Frick Building, 437 Grant St.

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Jayne A. Risk

Attorney at DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary

1650 Market Street, Suite 4900, One Liberty Place

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Stuart M. Brown

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1201 North Market Street, Suite 2100

Wilmington, DE 19801

Justin E. Kerner

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1650 Market Street, 49Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John D. Goetz

Attorney at Jones Day

One Mellon Center, Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Benjamin G. Minegar

Attorney at Jones Day

500 Grant Street, Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by IPENN VENTURES, L.P. (Bolock, J. Julius) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

(#22) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Respond to Remand Motion and Show Cause Order by KAPLAN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Minegar, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to This Court's 11 Rule to Show Cause by IPENN VENTURES, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bolock, J. Julius) Modified text on 12/3/2018. (ksa) Modified text on 12/3/2018 to correct document linkage. (ksa) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

18 #2

Certificate of Service

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Virginia College, LLC's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, and an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Remand Motion) by VIRGINIA COLLEGE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Kerner, Justin) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KAPLAN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Minegar, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/14/18. (jhi) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

1 #7

Certificate of Service

1 #6

Declarfation of Roger L. Swartzwelder

1 #5

Declaration of Brandt Hill

1 #4

Declaration of Stuart M. Brown

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Risk advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/21/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by IPENN VENTURES, L.P. (Bolock, J. Julius) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER. Plaintiff and Defendant Kaplan, Inc.'s Joint Motion (Doc. #22 ) for Extension of Time to Answer, to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, and to Respond to the Court's Show Cause Order (Doc. 15) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the Court's Show Cause Order (Doc. 15), and Kaplan shall respond to Plaintiff's remand motion and complaint, on or before 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/14/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Respond to Remand Motion and Show Cause Order by KAPLAN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Minegar, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #20 Motion to Extend Time. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Extend Time for Response to Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff's Response is due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/3/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to This Court's 11 Rule to Show Cause by IPENN VENTURES, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bolock, J. Julius) Modified text on 12/3/2018. (ksa) Modified text on 12/3/2018 to correct document linkage. (ksa) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Respond to Motion to Remand. Defendant Virginia College, LLC's deadlines to respond to the Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand are extended to 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Virginia College, LLC's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, and an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Remand Motion) by VIRGINIA COLLEGE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Kerner, Justin) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Respond to Motion to Remand by Defendant KAPLAN, INC. Defendant Kaplan, Inc.'s deadlines to respond to the Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand are extended to 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/29/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KAPLAN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Minegar, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER. Response(s) to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court (Doc. #7 ) are due by 11/30/2018. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), and no briefing schedule will issue. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/16/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by IPENN VENTURES, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Bolock, J.Julius) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by IPENN VENTURES, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bolock, J.Julius) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Julius Bolock on behalf of IPENN VENTURES, L.P.. (Bolock, J.) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VIRGINIA COLLEGE, LLC. (Kerner, Justin) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of VIRGINIA COLLEGE, LLC. (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin E. Kerner on behalf of VIRGINIA COLLEGE, LLC. (Kerner, Justin) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/14/18. (jhi) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Risk advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 11/21/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alleghey County, case number GD 18-013294 Copies attached: State Court Complaint and Docket Sheet (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4930840), filed by VIRGINIA COLLEGE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Stuart M. Brown, #5 Declaration of Brandt Hill, #6 Declaration of Roger L. Swartzwelder, #7 Certificate of Service) (ksa) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less