This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2018 at 07:40:35 (UTC).

INTERWORKS UNLIMITED, INC. et al v. DIGITAL GADGETS, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 INTERWORKS UNLIMITED, INC filed a lawsuit against DIGITAL GADGETS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD G. SMITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-MC-00163

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD G. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERWORKS UNLIMITED, INC.

Petitioner

QVC, INC.

Defendant

DIGITAL GADGETS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGER C. HSU

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROGER C HSU

175 South Lake Ave Suite 210

Pasadena, CA 91101

Petitioner Attorney

AMY S. KLINE

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

3800 Centre Square West, 1500 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

HARLAN M. LAZARUS

Attorney at LAZARUS & LAZARUS PC

240 Madison Ave 8Th Fl

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 8/20/18. 8/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER THAT THE #1 MOTION IS GRANTED. THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FORTH AS EXHIBIT "D" TO THE MOTION IS HEREBY APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 8/13/18.8/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION OF NON-PARTY QVC, INC. FOR APPROVAL OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITHMEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(amas) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Interworks Unlimited Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where QVC, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harlan Mitchell Lazarus