This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2018 at 08:19:32 (UTC).

Integrity Rehab Group, Inc. v. West Tennessee Bone & Joint Clinic, P.C.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Integrity Rehab Group, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against West Tennessee Bone Joint Clinic, P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Edward G. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02712

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Edward G. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Integrity Rehab Group, Inc.

Defendant

West Tennessee Bone & Joint Clinic, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Sinon Mulqueen

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN, CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, PC-Memphis

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER DENYING PENDING #2 MOTION AS MOOT DUE TO SETTLEMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/17/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement (Jointly filed by all Parties) by Integrity Rehab Group, Inc. (Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

10 #1

judge's card

#10

(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/15/18. (Attachments: #1 judge's card)(mbm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Donna W. Klutts. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

4 #1

judge's card

#4

(#4) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (jld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 judge's card) (mbm). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

3 #2

Exhibit Ex. B Addendum to Agreement

3 #1

Exhibit Ex. A Rehabilitation Services Agreement

#2

(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Integrity Rehab Group, Inc.. (Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

1 #7

Summons Summons

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Ex. E Invoices

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. D Third Addendum to Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. C Second Addendum to Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B Addendum to Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A Rehabilitation Services Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against West Tennessee Bone & Joint Clinic, P.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2902036), filed by Integrity Rehab Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Rehabilitation Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Addendum to Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Second Addendum to Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Third Addendum to Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Invoices, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons)(Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER DENYING PENDING #2 MOTION AS MOOT DUE TO SETTLEMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/17/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Settlement (Jointly filed by all Parties) by Integrity Rehab Group, Inc. (Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SETTING LETTER: Re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2018 01:30 PM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (Please be advised that the attorney for the Plaintiff will need to give the Defendant notice of the hearing.) (mbb) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/15/18. (Attachments: #1 judge's card)(mbm) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • NOTICE to all parties: This case was incorrectly opened in the Western Division of the Western District. It was transferred to the Jackson office and the case number has been modified. Please take notice of the case number, as the only change in the number will be the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. (Ex: 1:XX-cv-XXXX or 2:XX-cv-XXXX). The old case has been closed and will contain a case flag that it is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filing of future pleading to ensure that you are filing in the correct (OPEN) Case. The new case number is1:18-cv-2712. (jld) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Donna W. Klutts. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • (#8) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint,, filed by Integrity Rehab Group, Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note the Civil Cover Sheet should have a s/signature. Please see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. 10/15/2018 (jld). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (jld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 judge's card) (mbm). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Integrity Rehab Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Rehabilitation Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Addendum to Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Second Addendum to Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Third Addendum to Agreement)(Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Integrity Rehab Group, Inc.. (Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against West Tennessee Bone & Joint Clinic, P.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2902036), filed by Integrity Rehab Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Rehabilitation Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Addendum to Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Second Addendum to Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Third Addendum to Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Invoices, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons)(Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.