This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 12:45:16 (UTC).

INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS v. CHEN et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02229

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS

INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS an Illinois Non-profit corporation, individually, and on behalf of its affiliates doing business as IES ABROAD doing business as SAF doing business as THE STUDY ABROAD FOUNDATION

Defendants and Counter Claimants

QIAN CHEN

Grandville, MI 49418

INTERNATIONAL EDUCATON FOUNDATION, INC.

GEORGE CHEN

Grandville, MI 49418

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John David LaDue

Attorney at LADUE CURRAN & KUEHN LLC

100 East Wayne Street, Suite 300

South Bend, IN 46601

John A. Conway

Attorney at LADUE CURRAN KUEHN LLC

100 E. Wayne Street, Suite 300

South Bend, IN 46601

Amanda L.B. Mulroony

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

Wayne C. Turner

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Jacob R. Cox

Attorney at COX LAW OFFICE

1606 N. Delaware Street

Indianapolis, IN 46202

 

Court Documents

#20

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension

#15

#6

#5

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - corrected page 2 of Notice of Removal

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Filings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting Defendant International Education Foundation, Inc's #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint and counterclaims to 9/21/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff(s) to respond to the claims set forth in co- Defendant Chen's Counterclaims, is hereby extended up to and including 9/24/2018. Copy to Qian Chen via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/17/2018. (SWM) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to September 21, 2018 , filed by Counter Claimant INTERNATIONAL EDUCATON FOUNDATION, INC., Defendant INTERNATIONAL EDUCATON FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension)(Cox, Jacob) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Defendant Qian Chen's Counterclaims to 9/17/2018, Copy to Qian Chen via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/29/2018. (SWM) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting Defendant International Education Foundation, Inc's #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 9/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/27/2018. (SWM) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to September 17, 2018 (to Respond to Chen's Counterclaims), filed by Plaintiff INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS, Counter Defendant INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mulroony, Amanda) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to September 14, 2018 , filed by Defendant INTERNATIONAL EDUCATON FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension)(Cox, Jacob) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne C. Turner on behalf of Plaintiff INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS. (Turner, Wayne) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS. (Mulroony, Amanda) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS. (Mulroony, Amanda) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L.B. Mulroony on behalf of Plaintiff INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS. (Mulroony, Amanda) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant INTERNATIONAL EDUCATON FOUNDATION, INC.. (Cox, Jacob) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submission of State Court Records received from Marion County Superior Court on case 49D01-1806-PL-023248. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERNATIONAL EDUCATON FOUNDATION, INC.. (Cox, Jacob) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John David LaDue on behalf of Plaintiff INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS. (LaDue, John) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Conway on behalf of Plaintiff INSTITUTE FOR THE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION OF STUDENTS. (Conway, John) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant INTERNATIONAL EDUCATON FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - corrected page 2 of Notice of Removal)(Cox, Jacob) Modified on 7/23/2018 (REO). Modified on 7/24/2018 - added link to #1 (NAD). (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING re #1 Notice of Removal by International Education Foundation, Inc.. (Cox, Jacob) Modified on 7/23/2018 (REO). (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob R. Cox on behalf of Defendant International Education Foundation, Inc.. (Cox, Jacob) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court 1, case number 49D01-1806-PL-023248, filed by International Education Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4979232) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Filings)(Cox, Jacob) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wayne C. Turner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda L.B. Mulroony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D LaDue