This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/01/2018 at 07:27:51 (UTC).

Instant Checkmate, LLC v. Platinum Data Verifi LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 Instant Checkmate, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Platinum Data Verifi LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Houston and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01526

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Houston

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Instant Checkmate, LLC

Defendants

Does 1-10

CM Productions, LLC

SeekVerify LLC

Platinum Data Verifi LLC

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant

Platinum Data Verifi LLC

3Rd Party Defendant

Dark Rock Media PR LLC dba Magnetik Media

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J Busch

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

Brian H. Newman

Attorney at Dykema Gossett, LLP

333 So. Grand Ave., #2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A & B

1 #3

Copyright Report

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *4,442,142* cc:USPTO (lrc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Instant Checkmate, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Pubrec LLC for Instant Checkmate, LLC.. (lrc) (jao). (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CM Productions, LLC, Does 1-10, Platinum Data Verifi LLC, SeekVerify LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11404650.), filed by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A & B)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1526-JAH-KSC. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Busch, Matthew)(lrc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2018: #3 Copyright Report)[Copyright Report Mailed] (lrc). (sjt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: #4 AMENDED Copyright Report) (lrc). (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSTANT CHECK MATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian H. Newman