This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2018 at 07:57:05 (UTC).

Instant Checkmate, LLC v. DOES 1-10

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 Instant Checkmate, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against DOES 1-10. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernard G. Skomal and Cynthia Bashant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02132

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bernard G. Skomal

Presiding Judge

Cynthia Bashant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Instant Checkmate, LLC

Defendant

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J Busch

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Instant Checkmate, LLC re #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Busch, Matthew). (jah). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER Terminating Motion. Court terminates #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Instant Checkmate, LLC, because it lacks a memorandum of points and authorities and is superseded by ECF #7 . Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/15/2018. (jah) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

7 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#7

(#7) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Busch, Matthew). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Duplicate entry of #5 . Wrong event. No Proof of Service. QC Email sent to file Proof of Service (jah). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

6 #5

Exhibit D

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Table of Contents of Exhibits

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Damon W.D. Wright re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Busch, Matthew). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Has s/ of attorney not associated in case. Text has double wording. QC Email sent re ECF signature and duplicate text. Removed duplicate text (jah) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#5

(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Busch, Matthew). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Removed duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *TM No. 4,442,412* cc:USPTO (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Instant Checkmate, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Pubrec LLC for Instant Checkmate, LLC. (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

1 #4

Copyright Report

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibits A & B

1 #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11672190), filed by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibits A & B, #4 Copyright Report) (Copyright Report mailed). The new case number is 3:18-cv-02132-BAS-BGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Busch, Matthew)(cdw) (jao). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Instant Checkmate, LLC re #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Busch, Matthew). (jah). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Terminating Motion. Court terminates #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Instant Checkmate, LLC, because it lacks a memorandum of points and authorities and is superseded by ECF #7 . Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/15/2018. (jah) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Busch, Matthew). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Duplicate entry of #5 . Wrong event. No Proof of Service. QC Email sent to file Proof of Service (jah). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Damon W.D. Wright re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Busch, Matthew). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Has s/ of attorney not associated in case. Text has double wording. QC Email sent re ECF signature and duplicate text. Removed duplicate text (jah) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Busch, Matthew). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Removed duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *TM No. 4,442,412* cc:USPTO (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Instant Checkmate, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Pubrec LLC for Instant Checkmate, LLC. (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11672190), filed by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibits A & B, #4 Copyright Report) (Copyright Report mailed). The new case number is 3:18-cv-02132-BAS-BGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Busch, Matthew)(cdw) (jao). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSTANT CHECK MATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J Busch