This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2019 at 07:41:54 (UTC).

InnoBrilliance, LLC v. Selex ES Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 InnoBrilliance, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Selex ES Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher J. Burke and Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01875

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

InnoBrilliance, LLC

Defendant

Selex ES Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1306 North Broom Street, Suite 1

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorney

Kristen Healey Cramer

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to February 21, 2019 - filed by Selex ES Inc.. (Cramer, Kristen) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 1/22/2019 - filed by Selex ES Inc.. (Cramer, Kristen) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. Selex ES Inc. served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,711,150 B2 ;US 7,881,498 B2 ;US 8,009,870 B2. (lak) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Selex ES Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2512170.) - filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED D.I. #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to February 21, 2019 filed by Selex ES Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/15/2019. (dlb) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to February 21, 2019 - filed by Selex ES Inc.. (Cramer, Kristen) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • (#7) ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 18-1875-MN-CJB. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/7/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 1/22/2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Selex ES Inc. answer due 1/22/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/13/2018. (dlw) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 1/22/2019 - filed by Selex ES Inc.. (Cramer, Kristen) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. Selex ES Inc. served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Selex ES Inc. on 11/27/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,711,150 B2 ;US 7,881,498 B2 ;US 8,009,870 B2. (lak) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Selex ES Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2512170.) - filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INNOBRILLIANCE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Devlin