This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2018 at 05:57:23 (UTC).

Ingersoll v. Wexford Health Sources Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 Ingersoll filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wexford Health Sources Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael M. Mihm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-03064

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Mihm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Ingersoll

Lincoln, IL 62656

Defendants

Kess Roberson

Lisa Hopp

. Alexander

K. Stephens

Vipin Shah

Jane Doe #1

Jane Doe #4

C. Roy

Jane Doe #2

. Kotey

. Kottemen

Jane Doe #5

Wexford Health Sources Inc.

Jane Doe #3

T. Parker

. Ritz

D. Rains

D. Sprague

. Batterton

2 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Robert Ingersoll. Responses due by 4/16/2018 (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Robert Ingersoll.(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 4/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Ingersoll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Robert Ingersoll. Responses due by 4/16/2018 (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Robert Ingersoll. (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Robert Ingersoll.(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 4/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Ingersoll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less